Baby L., et al v Esper, et al
Plaintiff: Doe 1, Doe 2 and "Baby L."
Defendant: Michael Pompeo, Donna Welton, Doe Defendants 1-20 and Dr. Mark Esper
Case Number: 3:2020cv00009
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order: The parties propose to jointly submit proposed redacted versions of certain filings on or before April 27, 2020. This Court, finding it just and appropriate to do so, DIRECTS the parties to submit the referenced proposed redacted filings on or before that date, and further such relief as set forth in said order. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 4/23/2020. (hnw)
April 6, 2020 Filing 22 Sealed Document-Proposed Memorialization of Court's February 26, 2020 Order (hnw)
April 6, 2020 Filing 21 Sealed Document-Defendants' Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed Using Pseudonyms and Motion to Seal (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(hnw)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 4/6/2020 Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/20/2020. (hnw)
March 20, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Order to Respond, #1 MOTION to Seal MOTION for Leave to Proceed Using Pseudonyms by Doe Defendants 1-20, Mark Esper, Michael Pompeo, Donna Welton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wyer, Kathryn)
March 15, 2020 Filing 18 Sealed Transcript TRO Telephone Hearing held on <<2/26/2020 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mary J. Butenschoen, Telephone number 540-857-5100 Ext 5312. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 4/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2020. (mb)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Oral ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs' submissions (Dkt. 13, 14) will be SEALED pending further Order from the Court and the Court's disposition of Plaintiffs' combined Motion for Leave to Proceed Using Pseudonyms and Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt. 1). Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/13/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(hnw)
March 12, 2020 Filing 16 Financial arrangements made (Original) (3 Days Service) re #15 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 3/16/2020. (mb)
March 12, 2020 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (3 Day Service) by Doe Defendants 1-20, Mark Esper, Michael Pompeo, Donna Welton for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Petition for Temporary Restraining Order held on February 26, 2020 reported by Court Reporter Mary Butenschoen before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Wyer, Kathryn)
March 11, 2020 Filing 14 Sealed Document - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by "Baby L.", Doe 1, Doe 2 (Mast, Richard) Modified docket text and document security on 3/13/2020. (ca)
March 11, 2020 Filing 13 Sealed Document - PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING ON MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER SEAL AND PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS filed by "Baby L.", Doe 1, Doe 2. (Mast, Richard) Modified docket text and document security on 3/13/2020. (ca)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Directing the Plaintiffs' counsel to Respond to the Government's Submission #11 Sealed Document-Response. Responses due by 3/13/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/10/2020. (hnw)
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 Sealed Document-DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED USING PSEUDONYMS AND MOTION TO SEAL (hnw)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 Sealed Document-Notice (hnw)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Inviting the Government to Respond re #1 MOTION to Seal MOTION for Leave to Proceed Using Pseudonyms within Five (5) days of this Order. The Court Directs Plaintiffs' counsel to file a notice within Seven (7) days of this order addressing whether Plaintiffs intend to continue to prosecute this action, after the Court's order denying Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/4/2020. (hnw)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Oral ORDER; The Court orders the Government's notice submitted February 27, 2020 to be filed under seal, pending briefing on and the Court's disposition of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed Using Pseudonyms and to File and Proceed Under Seal (Dkt. 1), and any response by the Government to that motion. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/4/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(hnw)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 Sealed Document-MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(hnw)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 Sealed Document-PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED USING PSEUDONYMS,AND TO FILE AND PROCEED UNDER SEAL- Memorandum in Support (hnw)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 Sealed Document-VERIFIED COMPLAINT AND PETITION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit, X #25 Criminal Cover Sheet)(hnw)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Oral Order; The Court orders the Plaintiffs' filings in this case be sealed pending briefing on and the Court's disposition of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed Using Pseudonyms and to File and Proceed Under Seal ('Motion to Seal') (Dkt. 1). The Government shall file any brief responding to Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal no later than seven (7) days after the date of filing of Plaintiffs' public brief in support of their Motion to Seal. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 2/27/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(hnw)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Oral ORDER; Plaintiffs' counsel is DIRECTED to file on the Court's public docket within 24 hours of the issuance of this Order a public version of his brief in support of 'Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed Using Pseudonyms and to File and Proceed Under Seal,' which Plaintiffs' counsel tendered to this Court and sought to have filed under seal. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 2/27/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(hnw)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Using Pseudonyms, and MOTION to File and Proceed Under Seal by "Baby L.", Doe 1, Doe 2. (hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baby L., et al v Esper, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pompeo
Represented By: Kathryn L. Wyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Welton
Represented By: Kathryn L. Wyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-20
Represented By: Kathryn L. Wyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mark Esper
Represented By: Kathryn L. Wyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe 1
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe 2
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: "Baby L."
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?