Spheretex GmbH v. Carbon-Core Corp.
Plaintiff: Spheretex GmbH
Defendant: Carbon-Core Corp.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00053
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 Pretrial Order by Spheretex GmbH. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Worthington, Rebecca)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Oral ORDER granting #17 MOTION for Thomas J. Lloyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/23/20. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Thomas J. Lloyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3524111. by Spheretex GmbH. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Admit Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Worthington, Rebecca)
October 21, 2020 Filing 16 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (dg)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/21/2020. (dg)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Carbon-Core Corp. re #12 Request for Hearing (Oral Argument) (Powers, Robert)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #12 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) . filed by Carbon-Core Corp.. (Powers, Robert)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) by Carbon-Core Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, Robert)
October 5, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/28/2020. (dg)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Knut Woestehoff for Spheretex GmbH added. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/28/2020. (dg)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Franklin Powers on behalf of Carbon-Core Corp. (Powers, Robert)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Unopposed) by Carbon-Core Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, Robert)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spheretex GmbH (Worthington, Rebecca)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark; and Summons served on Tommy McWilliams/Authorized Registered Agent on September 8, 2020, filed by Spheretex GmbH.(Worthington, Rebecca)
September 21, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Knut Woestehoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3487942. by Spheretex GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Admit Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Worthington, Rebecca)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Requirement to Spheretex GmbH - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (dg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Trademark by the Clerk (dg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Carbon-Core Corp. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(dg)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carbon-Core Corp. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400. Receipt number 0423-3477833.), filed by Spheretex GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spheretex GmbH v. Carbon-Core Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spheretex GmbH
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Worthington
Represented By: Knut Woestehoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbon-Core Corp.
Represented By: Andrea Harris
Represented By: Robert Franklin Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?