Schilling v. Washburne et al
Plaintiff: Robert Schilling
Defendant: Leo Mallek, Richard Jake Washburne and John Does 1 and 2
Case Number: 3:2021cv00022
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - The Court hereby ADOPTS the deadline modifications proposed in the Joint Rule 26(f) Plan and AMENDS the Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 08/17/2021. (dg)
August 13, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Leo Mallek, Richard Jake Washburne. (Guynn, Jim)
August 12, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings)Video Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2021 10:00 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. (hnw)
August 11, 2021 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Guynn, Jim)
August 10, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for November 17-18, 2022 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw)
August 6, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Robert Schilling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hardin, Matthew)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part #10 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss no later than August 6, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 7/29/21. (kld)
July 29, 2021 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Motion Hearing held on 7/29/2021 re #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Pretrial Order, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge filed by Robert Schilling. (AT&T Conf Manager: Karen Dotson) (kld)
July 29, 2021 Filing 14 Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Harrisonburg Division held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 7/29/21. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. AT&T Conf Manager: Karen Dotson (kld)
July 27, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Pretrial Order and Scheduling Conference: (FTR) Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2021 09:30 AM by telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Oral ORDER granting in part and taking under advisement #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The time for plaintiff to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss is extended to August 6, 2021. In the next few days, the court intends to hold a combined scheduling conference and hearing on plaintiff's motion to amend the pretrial order. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 7/27/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
July 26, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 Brief / Memorandum in Support by Robert Schilling. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hardin, Matthew)
July 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Pretrial Order, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge by Robert Schilling. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Hardin, Matthew)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2021 10:00 AM by telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER, CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 07/19/2021. (dg)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Leo Mallek, Richard Jake Washburne. (Guynn, Jim)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Leo Mallek, Richard Jake Washburne. (Guynn, Jim)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Schilling re #2 Electronic Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (NOTICE PURSUANT TO VA. CODE 8.01-296 (2)(b)), #2 Envelope)(Hardin, Matthew)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN of service of Summons & Complaint on 6/23/2021 upon Leo Mallek (POSTED)(Hardin, Matthew)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN of service of Summons & Complaint on 6/23/2021 upon Richard "Jake" Washburn(Hardin, Matthew)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Leo Mallek, Richard Jake Washburne NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(dg)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1 and 2, Leo Mallek, Richard Jake Washburne (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402. Receipt number AVAWDC-3727044.), filed by Robert Schilling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schilling v. Washburne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Mallek
Represented By: Jim H. Guynn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Jake Washburne
Represented By: Jim H. Guynn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 and 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schilling
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?