Morris et al v. Rhett's, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Morris and Christian Hernandez
Defendant: Rhett's, LLC doing business as Rhett's Bar and Grill and Christopher Rhett Craddock
Case Number: 3:2021cv00041
Filed: November 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Voluntary Dismiss - Stipulation of Dismissal and Joint Motion to Enter Final Order - by Christopher Rhett Craddock, Rhett's, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leeson, Todd)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 1/19/2022 Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 12/27/2021. (hnw)
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Christopher Rhett Craddock, Rhett's, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leeson, Todd)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 12/13/2021. (dg)
November 30, 2021 Filing 11 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Christopher Rhett Craddock (Sowell, Imani)
November 30, 2021 Filing 10 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rhett's, LLC (Sowell, Imani)
November 30, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Christopher Rhett Craddock, Rhett's, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sowell, Imani)
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Imani E. Sowell on behalf of All Defendants (Sowell, Imani)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A. Leeson on behalf of All Defendants (Leeson, Todd)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Christopher Rhett Craddock on 11/10/2021, filed by Christian Hernandez, Amanda Morris.(Goodley, James)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Rhett's, LLC on 11/10/2021, filed by Christian Hernandez, Amanda Morris.(Goodley, James)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Christopher Rhett Craddock, Rhett's, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(dg) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/8/2021) (dg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/8/2021) (dg). Modified on 11/8/2021 to replace summons with corrected versions (dg).
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Christopher Rhett Craddock by Christian Hernandez, Amanda Morris (Goodley, James)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Rhett's, LLC by Christian Hernandez, Amanda Morris (Goodley, James)
November 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Rhett Craddock, Rhett's, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402. Receipt number AVAWDC-3825967.), filed by Amanda Morris, Christian Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg) Modified on 11/8/2021 to correct date filed (dg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris et al v. Rhett's, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Morris
Represented By: James Edward Goodley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Hernandez
Represented By: James Edward Goodley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhett's, LLC doing business as Rhett's Bar and Grill
Represented By: Imani E. Sowell
Represented By: Todd A. Leeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Rhett Craddock
Represented By: Imani E. Sowell
Represented By: Todd A. Leeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?