Haynes v. Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia
Plaintiff: Keith Haynes
Defendant: University of Virginia Health and Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia
Case Number: 3:2021cv00046
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE by Keith Haynes re #4 , #8 ripeness for decision (Lloyd, Edward)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order re: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Modify pretrial deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/13/2022. (hnw)
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Daniel, Bret)
December 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) Bench Trial set for September 22-23, 2022 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . filed by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Ebanks, Elizabeth)
December 13, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia.(Ebanks, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 Certified True Paper Copies of State Court Record(s) received from Charlottesville Circuit Court, case number(s) CL21-537 consisting of 1 Folder. (hnw)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDER, CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/30/2021. (hnw)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Keith Haynes. (Lloyd, Edward)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against University of Virginia Health, filed by Keith Haynes.(Lloyd, Edward)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Charlottesville Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/22/2021. (hnw)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlottesville Circuit Court, case number CL21-537. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402), filed by University of Virginia Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. Motion for TRO, #3 Exhibit C. Defendant's Obj, #4 Exhibit D. Order Denying Motion, #5 Exhibit E. Emails, #6 Exhibit F. Notice of Filing, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Haynes
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Virginia Health
Represented By: Bret Gregory Daniel
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Ebanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia
Represented By: Bret Gregory Daniel
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Ebanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?