Prater v. Corley et al
Plaintiff: Earnest Prater, Jr.
Defendant: James L. Corley, Jr., Verify Inc., Vendor Surveillance Corp. and John Does I through X
Case Number: 3:2022cv00017
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) Status Conference set for 8/25/2022 09:00 AM by telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel. (kld)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order re: #6 Pretrial Order, amending expert deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 6/8/2022. (hnw)
June 7, 2022 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Scheduling Conference Call held in chambers on 6/7/2022. (kld)
June 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) Jury Trial set for February 13-15, 2023 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw)
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 Original State Court Record(s) received from Orange County Circuit Court, case number(s) CL22-174 consisting of 1 Folder. (hnw)
May 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2022 09:30 AM by telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel. (kld)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL ORDER, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 4/26/2022. (hnw)
April 26, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by James L. Corley, Jr, Vendor Surveillance Corp., Verify Inc..(Moriarty, Joseph)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Orange County Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by James L. Corley, Jr., Vendor Surveillance Corp., Verify Inc.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 4/25/2022. (hnw)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vendor Surveillance Corp., Verify Inc. (Moriarty, Joseph)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Requirement to Vendor Surveillance Corp., Verify Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (hnw)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number CL22-174. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt no. 3932800), filed by Vendor Surveillance Corp., James L. Corley, Jr, Verify Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw) (Additional attachment(s) #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint with Summons) (hnw). Modified on 4/20/2022 to correct typographical error/Exhibit(hnw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prater v. Corley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest Prater, Jr.
Represented By: Stephanie Swanson Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Corley, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Moriarty
Represented By: Paris Henry Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verify Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Moriarty
Represented By: Paris Henry Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vendor Surveillance Corp.
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Moriarty
Represented By: Paris Henry Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I through X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?