Petty v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jasmine A. Petty
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2022cv00038
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2022 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
August 4, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons for issuance as to Commissioner of Social Security by Jasmine A. Petty (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Goss, John)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORAL ORDER granting #4 Motion to Strike #4 MOTION to Strike #3 Status Report Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/4/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
August 4, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Strike #3 Status Report by Jasmine A. Petty. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goss, John)
August 3, 2022 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT by Jasmine A. Petty (Goss, John)
July 1, 2022 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (hnw)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number 3980323.), filed by Jasmine A. Petty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petty v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine A. Petty
Represented By: John Osborne Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?