Doe et al v. Mast et al
Plaintiff: Baby Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe
Defendant: Joshua Mast, Stephanie Mast, Richard Mast, Kimberley Motley, Ahmad Osmani, United States Secretary of State Anthony Blinken and United States Secretary of Defense General Lloyd Austin
Case Number: 3:2022cv00049
Filed: September 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE by Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe re #69 (Eckstein, Maya)
October 28, 2022 Filing 69 MOTION to Seal Amended Complaint and Exhibit by Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckstein, Maya)
October 28, 2022 Filing 68 AMENDED COMPLAINT REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION against All Defendants, filed by Jane Doe, Baby Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Eckstein, Maya)
October 28, 2022 Filing 67 MOTION for Sidney Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-4062311. by Kimberley Motley. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davison, Thomas)
October 27, 2022 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Lynn Van Winter on behalf of Kimberley Motley (Van Winter, Samantha)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PRETRIAL ORDER (CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe as set forth herein). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on October 26, 2022. (ca)
October 24, 2022 Filing 64 Sealed Document - Defendant Richard Mast's Unredacted Memorandum in Support of his Motion to Dismiss. (dg)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Seal. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/24/2022. (dg)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Seal. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/24/2022. (dg)
October 24, 2022 Filing 61 Sealed Document - Defendants Joshua and Stephanie Mast's Unredacted Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(dg)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Seal. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/24/2022. (dg)
October 17, 2022 Filing 59 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim . filed by Kimberley Motley. (Davison, Thomas)
October 17, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Kimberley Motley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WFA Entity Info, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davison, Thomas)
October 17, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Roger Hoernlein on behalf of Kimberley Motley (Hoernlein, Michael)
October 14, 2022 Filing 56 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal and Subject Matter) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or for Abstention . filed by Ahmad Osmani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mr. Osmani)(Brooks, Brennan)
October 14, 2022 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal and Subject Matter), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or for Abstention by Ahmad Osmani. (Brooks, Brennan)
October 14, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION to Seal by Richard Mast. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mast, Richard)
October 14, 2022 Filing 53 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Richard Mast. (Mast, Richard)
October 14, 2022 Filing 52 MOTION to Seal Memorandum and Supporting Exhibits by Joshua Mast, Stephanie Mast. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moran, John)
October 14, 2022 Filing 51 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Redacted). filed by Joshua Mast, Stephanie Mast. (Moran, John)
October 14, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance as pro hac vice counsel for Defendant Ahmad Osmani by Brennan Tyler Brooks on behalf of Ahmad Osmani (Brooks, Brennan)
October 14, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Joshua Mast, Stephanie Mast. (Moran, John)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORAL ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion of B. Tyler Brooks to appear pro hac vice, and finding the requirements for pro hac vice admission have been satisfied and for good cause shown, the Court grants the motion. Dkt. 45. B. Tyler Brooks may appear and practice pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Defendant Ahmad Osmani. See W.D. Va. Gen. R. 6(d). Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/14/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORAL ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion of Michael R. Hoernlein to appear pro hac vice, and finding the requirements for pro hac vice admission have been satisfied and for good cause shown, the Court grants the motion. Dkt. 46. Michael Hoernlein may appear and practice pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Defendant Kimberly Motley. See W.D. Va. Gen. R. 6(d). Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/14/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg)
October 7, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION for Michael R. Hoernlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-4048296. by Kimberley Motley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davison, Thomas)
October 5, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION for B. Tyler Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-4046726. by Ahmad Osmani. (Boyer, Richard)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORAL ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant Richard L. Mast's motion for extension of time to file a response, finding the motion unopposed, noting the comparable extension afforded Defendants Joshua and Stephanie Mast, and finding good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS Defendant Richard L. Mast's motion for extension. Dkt. 36. Defendant Richard L. Mast shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by October 14, 2022. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/28/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORAL ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant Ahmad Osmani's motion for extension of time to file a response, finding the motion unopposed, noting the comparable extension afforded Defendants Joshua and Stephanie Mast, and finding good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS Defendant Ahmad Osmani's motion for extension. Dkt. 38. Defendant Ahmad Osmani shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by October 14, 2022. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/28/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORAL ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant Kimberly Motley's motion for extension of time to file a response, finding the motion unopposed, noting the similar extensions afforded other defendants and finding good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS Defendant Kimberly Motley's motion for extension. Dkt. 41. Defendant Kimberly Motley shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by October 17, 2022. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/28/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg)
September 27, 2022 Filing 41 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Or Other Responsive Pleading by Kimberley Motley. (Davison, Thomas)
September 27, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas William Davison on behalf of Kimberley Motley (Davison, Thomas)
September 27, 2022 Filing 39 MOTION to Seal Docket Numbers 10, 11, and 12 by Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckstein, Maya)
September 27, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ahmad Osmani. (Boyer, Richard)
September 27, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Dean Boyer on behalf of Ahmad Osmani (Boyer, Richard)
September 26, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Richard Mast. (Mast, Richard)
September 26, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Mast, Jr on behalf of Richard Mast (Mast, Richard)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORAL ORDER: This Court has considered Defendants Joshua and Stephanie Masts' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint, Dkt. 31, as well as Plaintiffs' opposition thereto and Defendants' reply in further support of their motion, Dkts. 32, 33. Upon review of Defendants' arguments concerning the recency of counsel's participation in the matter and their competing pre-existing obligations in other specified litigation, Dkt. 31 paras. 3, 4, the Court finds good cause has been shown for an extension to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Accordingly, for that reason, the Court will grant in part Defendants' motion for extension. Dkt. 31. Defendants Joshua and Stephanie Masts' response deadline will be and hereby is extended until Friday, October 14, 2022. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/23/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg)
September 23, 2022 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . filed by Joshua Mast, Stephanie Mast. (Moran, John)
September 23, 2022 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . filed by Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe. (Eckstein, Maya)
September 22, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Joshua Mast, Stephanie Mast. (Moran, John)
September 20, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by John Savage Moran on behalf of Joshua Mast, Stephanie Mast (Moran, John)
September 15, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Sherli M. Furst on behalf of Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe (Furst, Sherli)
September 14, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Carlton King on behalf of Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe (King, Jeremy)
September 13, 2022 Filing 27 RETURN of service of Kimberley Motley on 09/07/2022 upon Kimberley Motley(Eckstein, Maya)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to proceed under a pseudonym and for entry of the protective order will be and hereby is GRANTED. Dkt. 3. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/13/2022. (dg)
September 13, 2022 Filing 25 RETURN of service of Stephanie Mast on 09/02/2022 upon Stephanie Mast(Eckstein, Maya)
September 13, 2022 Filing 24 RETURN of service of Joshua Mast on 09/02/2022 upon Joshua Mast(Eckstein, Maya)
September 12, 2022 Filing 23 First NOTICE of Appearance by Sehla Ashai on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ashai, Sehla)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORAL ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion of Sehla Ashai to appear pro hac vice, and finding the requirements for pro hac vice admission have been satisfied and for good cause shown, the Court grants the motion. Dkt. 12. Sehla Ashai may appear and practice pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiffs. See W.D. Va. Gen. R. 6(d). Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/12/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORAL ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion of Sherli Furst to appear pro hac vice, and finding the requirements for pro hac vice admission have been satisfied and for good cause shown, the Court grants the motion. Dkt. 11. Sherli Furst may appear and practice pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiffs. See W.D. Va. Gen. R. 6(d). Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/12/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORAL ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion of Jeremy King to appear pro hac vice, and finding the requirements for pro hac vice admission have been satisfied and for good cause shown, the Court grants the motion. Dkt. 10. Jeremy King may appear and practice pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiffs. See W.D. Va. Gen. R. 6(d). Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/12/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg)
September 12, 2022 Filing 19 RETURN of service of Ahmad Osmani on 09/06/2022 upon Ahmad Osmani(Eckstein, Maya)
September 12, 2022 Filing 18 RETURN of service of Richard Mast on 09/06/2022 upon Richard Mast(Eckstein, Maya)
September 12, 2022 Filing 17 RETURN of service of Antony Blinken on 09/08/2022 upon Angie Taylor(Eckstein, Maya)
September 12, 2022 Filing 16 RETURN of service of Lloyd Austin on 09/08/2022 upon Angie Taylor(Eckstein, Maya)
September 8, 2022 Filing 15 Sealed Document - Exhibits A, B, D to Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and for Entry of Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D)(dg)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Seal. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/08/2022. (dg)
September 7, 2022 Filing 13 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Secretary of Defense General Lloyd Austin, United States Secretary of State Anthony Blinken NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(dg)
September 6, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Sehla Ashai to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-4025197. by Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ashai, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Eckstein, Maya)
September 6, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Sherli Furst to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-4024976. by Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Furst, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Eckstein, Maya)
September 6, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Jeremy King to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-4024963. by Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of King, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Eckstein, Maya)
September 6, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Summons for Antony Blinken by Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe (Eckstein, Maya)
September 6, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Summons for Lloyd Austin by Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe (Eckstein, Maya)
September 2, 2022 Filing 7 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A,B,D MOTION to Seal Document #5 Notice (Other) . filed by Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe. (Eckstein, Maya)
September 2, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A,B,D, MOTION to Seal Document #5 Notice (Other) by Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Seal)(Eckstein, Maya)
September 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe re #4 Notice of Filing Exhibits A,B,D under seal (Eckstein, Maya)
September 2, 2022 Filing 4 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Leave to File and Proceed under Pseudonyms and for Entry of a Protective Order . filed by Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A-FILED UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit EX B-FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order, #4 Exhibit EX D-FILED UNDER SEAL)(Eckstein, Maya)
September 2, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File and Proceed under Pseudonyms and for Entry of a Protective Order by Baby Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe. (Eckstein, Maya)
September 2, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Joshua Mast, Richard Mast, Stephanie Mast, Kimberley Motley, Ahmad Osmani. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Summons Issued, #4 Summons Issued)(dg)
September 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joshua Mast, Richard Mast, Stephanie Mast, Kimberley Motley, Ahmad Osmani (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number 30003849.), filed by Jane Doe, Baby Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Mast et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baby Doe
Represented By: Lewis Franklin Powell, III
Represented By: Maya Miriam Eckstein
Represented By: Sehla Ashai
Represented By: Jeremy Carlton King
Represented By: Sherli M. Furst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Lewis Franklin Powell, III
Represented By: Maya Miriam Eckstein
Represented By: Sehla Ashai
Represented By: Jeremy Carlton King
Represented By: Sherli M. Furst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Lewis Franklin Powell, III
Represented By: Maya Miriam Eckstein
Represented By: Sehla Ashai
Represented By: Jeremy Carlton King
Represented By: Sherli M. Furst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Mast
Represented By: John Savage Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Mast
Represented By: John Savage Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Mast
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberley Motley
Represented By: Michael Roger Hoernlein
Represented By: Thomas William Davison
Represented By: Samantha Lynn Van Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmad Osmani
Represented By: Brennan Tyler Brooks
Represented By: Richard Dean Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Secretary of State Anthony Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Secretary of Defense General Lloyd Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?