Nelson v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Robert Nelson
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2024cv00028
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2024 01:00 PM by telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (kld)
June 3, 2024 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Plaintiff Robert Nelson (Feinman, James)
May 24, 2024 Filing 9 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company (Jackson, Rachel)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER. All nondispositive pretrial motions and issues, including any requested changes in this order, are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 5/21/2024. (dsa)
May 21, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations)(Jackson, Rachel)
May 21, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Requirement to Ford Motor Company - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (kmc)
May 20, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Jackson, Rachel)
May 13, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Nelson. Ford Motor Company served on 4/30/2024, answer due 5/21/2024.(Feinman, James)
April 29, 2024 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (dsa)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Jurisdiction Cases by Robert Nelson. (dsa)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company (Filing & Administrative fee $ 405 receipt number AVAWDC-4416152), filed by Robert Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Nelson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Rachel Elaina Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?