Doe v. Pittsylvania County, Virginia et al

Defendant: Pittsylvania County, Virginia and Board of Supervisors of Pittsylvania County, Virginia
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Case Number: 4:2011cv00043
Filed: September 26, 2011
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Danville Office
Referring Judge: Robert S. Ballou
Presiding Judge: Michael F. Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/4/14. (ham)
February 3, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/3/12. (ham)
February 3, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/3/12. (ham)
February 3, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/3/12. (ham)
February 3, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/3/12. (ham)
March 27, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 3/26/13. (ham)
March 27, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 3/26/13. (ham)
March 27, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court DISMISSAL ORDER granting 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 59 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking case from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 3/26/13. (ham)
August 26, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses; adopting 92 Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/26/13. (ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Pittsylvania County, Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsylvania County, Virginia
Represented By: William Martin Stanley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Pittsylvania County, Virginia
Represented By: William Martin Stanley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Frank Morris Feibelman
Represented By: Thomas Okuda Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Rebecca Kim Glenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.