Sae Han Sheet Co., Ltd. v. Commonwealth Laminating and Coating, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: SAE HAN SHEET CO., LTD.
Defendant: ABC Companies 1 through 20, Commonwealth Laminating and Coating, Inc., EASTMAN CHEMICAL CORP. and John Does I through 20
Case Number: 4:2018cv00074
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Jackson L Kiser
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Commonwealth Laminating and Coating, Inc., EASTMAN CHEMICAL CORP.. (Fender, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Filing 31 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #22 Brief / Memorandum in Support, #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by SAE HAN SHEET CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration in Support)(Park, Sang)
January 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: (CR) Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2019 at 03:00 PM in Danville before Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser. (ham)
January 11, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Requested Hearing by Attorney for EASTMAN CHEMICAL CORP. re #22 Brief / Memorandum in Support, #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss hearing date February 28, 2019, at 3:00 PM, at U.S. District Court, Danville, before Judge Kiser. Confirmation notice to be sent by the Clerk's Office. (DiStanislao, Phillip)
January 10, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) Jury Trial set for 10/29/2019 - 10/31/2019 at 09:30 AM in Danville before Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ham)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 MOTION for Michael S. Kimm to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael S. Kimm for SAE HAN SHEET CO., LTD. added. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 1/10/19. (ham)
January 9, 2019 Filing 26 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAE HAN SHEET CO., LTD. (Park, Sang)
January 9, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Michael S. Kimm to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3046677. by SAE HAN SHEET CO., LTD..Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Park, Sang)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL ORDER, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 1/4/19. (ham)
January 4, 2019 Filing 23 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ham)
January 4, 2019 Filing 22 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Commonwealth Laminating and Coating, Inc., EASTMAN CHEMICAL CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fender, Matthew)
January 4, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Commonwealth Laminating and Coating, Inc., EASTMAN CHEMICAL CORP.. (Fender, Matthew)
January 4, 2019 Notice of Filing Requirement to SAE HAN SHEET CO., LTD. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ham)
December 21, 2018 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-01225. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 21, 2018 Case transferred to District of Western District of Virginia, Danville Division. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia, Danville Division. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/21/2018. (See order for further details). (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by Sae Han Sheet Co., Ltd. Notice of Plaintiff's Consent to Transfer (Park, Sang) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Sae Han Sheet Co., Ltd. Affidavit of Service as to Eastman Chemical (Park, Sang) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE by Sae Han Sheet Co., Ltd. Affidavit of Service as to Commonwealth Laminating (Park, Sang) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
December 20, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the Alternative to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED that plaintiff shall have until December 21, 2018 at noon to notify the Court whether it consents to the transfer of this matter or whether it intends to oppose defendants' transfer motion. If plaintiff does not file an appropriate notice by this deadline, the matter will be transferred for the reasons set forth in defendants' motion and memorandum in support. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/19/2018. (jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Hearing Date set for 1/11/2019 re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the Alternative to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Fender, Matthew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the Alternative to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Commonwealth Laminating and Coating, Inc., Eastman Chemical Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Fender, Matthew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the Alternative to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Commonwealth Laminating and Coating, Inc., Eastman Chemical Corp.. (Fender, Matthew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Commonwealth Laminating and Coating, Inc., Eastman Chemical Corp.. (Fender, Matthew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - In this case, plaintiff filed its complaint on September 26, 2018, making its deadline to serve defendants December 26, 20l8. Because plaintiff's service deadline is only fourteen (14) days away, plaintiff is warned that failure to serve the defendants by this deadline will result in the dismissal of plaintiff's claims. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/12/2018. (See order for further details). (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth Laminating and Coating, Inc., Eastman Chemical Corp.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
November 6, 2018 Notice of Correction re #8 Proposed Summons. The filer has been notified that DE #8 is a duplicate filing and will not be issued. (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Summons by Sae Han Sheet Co., Ltd.. (Park, Sang) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Summons by Sae Han Sheet Co., Ltd.. (Park, Sang) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons by Sae Han Sheet Co., Ltd.. (Park, Sang) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sang Kuen Park on behalf of Sae Han Sheet Co., Ltd. (Park, Sang) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice for Michael S. Kimm. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/11/2018. (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael S. Kimm and Certification of Local Counsel Sang K. Park Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6300316. amended pro hac vice application by Sae Han Sheet Co., Ltd.. (Park, Sang) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael S. Kimm and Certification of Local Counsel Sang K. Park Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6291736. by Sae Han Sheet Co., Ltd.. (Park, Sang) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC Companies 1 through 20, Commonwealth Laminating and Coating, Inc., John Does I through 20, Eastman Chemical Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6290145.), filed by Sae Han Sheet Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/21/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sae Han Sheet Co., Ltd. v. Commonwealth Laminating and Coating, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Laminating and Coating, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Devane Fender
Represented By: Phillip Thomas DiStanislao, III.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTMAN CHEMICAL CORP.
Represented By: Matthew Devane Fender
Represented By: Phillip Thomas DiStanislao, III.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAE HAN SHEET CO., LTD.
Represented By: Sang Kuen Park
Represented By: Michael S. Kimm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?