Edwards v. Long
Plaintiff: Theresa M. Edwards
Defendant: Alexander T. Long
Case Number: 4:2019cv00022
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Jackson L Kiser
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) Jury Trial set for 3/12/2020 - 3/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Danville before Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ham)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDER, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 6/11/19. (ham)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ham)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Certified State Court Records received electronically from Henry County Circuit Court, CL19000482-00. (ham)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Henry County Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 5/13/19. (ham)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Henry County Circuit Court, case number CL19000482-00 (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00; pay.gov receipt number 0423-3140828) filed by Alexander T. Long. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents & Things, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander T. Long
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Piasta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa M. Edwards
Represented By: Robert Clayton Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?