Stockton v. Branch Banking & Trust Company
Plaintiff: Mytreccia Stockton
Defendant: Branch Banking & Trust Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00027
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Jackson L Kiser
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing on Motions #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM & #13 MOTION to Remand previously set for 8/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Danville before Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser: (CR) Motion Hearing reset for 9/24/2019 at 11:00 AM in Danville before Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser. (ham)
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand . filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Grundmann, Carrie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and #13 MOTION to Remand previously set for 7/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Danville before Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser: (CR) Motion Hearing reset for 8/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Danville before Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser. (ham)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Grundmann, Carrie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) Bench Trial set for 5/1/2020 at 09:30 AM in Danville before Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ham)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and #13 MOTION to Remand: (CR) Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Danville before Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser. (ham)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand/RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mytreccia Stockton. (Attachment: #1 Bill of Particulars)(ham) Modified on 7/11/2019 - included text as to Motion to Remand pursuant to instructions of Law Clerk (ham).
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Additional Paper State Court Records received from Henry County General District Court, GV19000793-00, consisting of 8 pages - removal paperwork. (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (ham)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Roseboro Notice to Mytreccia Stockton. Deadline set for 7/8/2019. (mlh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Paper State Court Records received from Henry County General District Court, GV19000793-00, consisting of 19 pages total. (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (mlh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Grundmann, Carrie)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Grundmann, Carrie)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Branch Banking & Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent BB&T Corporation for Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Grundmann, Carrie)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL ORDER, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 6/14/2019. (mlh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Requirement to Branch Banking & Trust Company - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (mlh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (mlh)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Henry County General District Court. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 6/14/2019. (mlh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT by Branch Banking & Trust Company as filed in Henry County General District Court. (mlh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Henry County General District Court, case number GV19000793-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00; 0423-3163068), filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Warrant in Debt, #2 Plaintiff's Bill of Particulars, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stockton v. Branch Banking & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mytreccia Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Banking & Trust Company
Represented By: Carrie H. Grundmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?