White v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Margaret White
Defendant: Sergeant Parnell, Lieutenant J. Cruise, Lieutenant J. Cooper, Sheriff Steve M. Draper, Sergeant Walker, Deputy B. Nunn, Sergeant Gary and Deputy Rumley
Case Number: 4:2020cv00001
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Jackson L Kiser
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 3/2/2020. (ham)
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ham)
March 2, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by J. Cooper, J. Cruise, Steve M. Draper, Gary, B. Nunn, Parnell, Rumley, Walker.(Schnetzler, Nathan)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; J. Cooper answer due 3/2/2020; J. Cruise answer due 3/2/2020; Steve M. Draper answer due 3/2/2020; Gary answer due 3/2/2020; B. Nunn answer due 3/2/2020; Parnell answer due 3/2/2020; Rumley answer due 3/2/2020; Walker answer due 3/2/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 2/13/2020. (ham)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret White. Gary served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020.(Carroll, Seth)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret White. Walker served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020.(Carroll, Seth)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret White. Rumley served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020.(Carroll, Seth)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret White. Steve M. Draper served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020.(Carroll, Seth)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret White. J. Cruise served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020.(Carroll, Seth)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret White. J. Cooper served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020.(Carroll, Seth)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by J. Cooper, J. Cruise, Steve M. Draper, Gary, B. Nunn, Parnell, Rumley, Walker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Henry Schnetzler on behalf of All Defendants (Schnetzler, Nathan)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to J. Cooper, J. Cruise, Steve M. Draper, Gary, B. Nunn, Parnell, Rumley, Walker. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ham)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J. Cooper, J. Cruise, Steve M. Draper, Gary, B. Nunn, Parnell, Rumley, Walker (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00; pay.gov receipt number 0423-3302270) filed by Margaret White. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Parnell
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant J. Cruise
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant J. Cooper
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Steve M. Draper
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Walker
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy B. Nunn
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Gary
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Rumley
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret White
Represented By: Seth R. Carroll
Represented By: Connor Scott Bleakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?