Burnopp v. Carter Bank & Trust
Plaintiff: Donna Burnopp
Defendant: Carter Bank & Trust
Case Number: 4:2020cv00052
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2020 01:00 PM by teleconference before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Dialing instructions to follow separately. (ssm)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counts II-IV of Plaintiff's Complaint. filed by Carter Bank & Trust. (Melton, Kameron)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Donna Burnopp. (Haddox, Brittany)
October 5, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
October 4, 2020 Filing 8 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carter Bank & Trust (Treece, Joshua)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Filing Requirement to Carter Bank & Trust - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ham)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (ham)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Carter Bank & Trust. (Treece, Joshua)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Carter Bank & Trust. (Treece, Joshua)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 21, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Joyce Parker, Registered Agent on September 9, 2020, filed by Donna Burnopp.(Haddox, Brittany)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Carter Bank & Trust. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ham)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carter Bank & Trust (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00; pay.gov receipt number 0423-3475230) filed by Donna Burnopp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnopp v. Carter Bank & Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Burnopp
Represented By: Norvell Winston West, IV.
Represented By: Brittany Michelle Haddox
Represented By: Linda Leigh Strelka
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Strelka
Represented By: Monica Lynn Mroz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Bank & Trust
Represented By: Kameron Virginia Melton
Represented By: Joshua Richard Treece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?