Clark et al v. Stanley Furniture Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert J. Smith, Doug I. Payne, William G. Perdue, Kelly S. Cain, Jesse V. Cannaday, Robert Anthony Vanore, Jay N. Busey, Larry E. Webb, Jr., Alexander Teglas, Jr., William A. Sibbick, Jr., Charles William Cubberley, Jr., John W. Johnson, Herman Ellsworth Haley, Jr., Dave P. Maddox, Calvert Fulcher, Jr., John Hart Matthews, Melvin Clark and Douglas I. Payne
Defendant: Stanley Furniture Company LLC, Supplemental Retirement Plan of Stanley Furniture Company, Inc., Stone & Leigh, LLC and Stanley Interiors Corporation Deferred Compensation Capital Enhancement Plan
Case Number: 4:2020cv00063
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Stone & Leigh, LLC, Supplemental Retirement Plan of Stanley Furniture Company, Inc. by Dave P. Maddox, Alexander Teglas, Jr, Calvert Fulcher, Jr, Charles William Cubberley, Jr, Melvin Clark, Jesse V. Cannaday, John W. Johnson, Herman Ellsworth Haley, Jr, Larry E. Webb, Jr, Kelly S. Cain, William G. Perdue, Robert J. Smith, Douglas I. Payne, Jay N. Busey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martin, Daniel)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Andrew Hutchinson on behalf of Stone & Leigh, LLC (Hutchinson, Richard)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by J. David Folds on behalf of Stone & Leigh, LLC (Folds, J.)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Stone & Leigh, LLC and Supplemental Retirement Plan of Stanley Furniture Company, Inc. (ham)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Entry of Default by Jay N. Busey, Kelly S. Cain, Jesse V. Cannaday, Melvin Clark, Charles William Cubberley, Jr, Calvert Fulcher, Jr, Herman Ellsworth Haley, Jr, John W. Johnson, Dave P. Maddox, Douglas I. Payne, William G. Perdue, Robert J. Smith, Alexander Teglas, Jr, Larry E. Webb, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ching, Carrol)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance for Russell L. Hirschhorn by Russell Laurence Hirschhorn on behalf of Stanley Furniture Company LLC, Stanley Interiors Corporation Deferred Compensation Capital Enhancement Plan (Hirschhorn, Russell)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Russell L. Hirschhorn. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 12/4/2020. (ham)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Stanley Furniture Company LLC answer due 1/15/2021; Stanley Interiors Corporation Deferred Compensation Capital Enhancement Plan answer due 1/15/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 12/4/2020. (ham)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for RUSSELL L. HIRSCHHORN to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3564476. by Stanley Furniture Company LLC, Stanley Interiors Corporation Deferred Compensation Capital Enhancement Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merritt, Craig)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer [CONSENT MOTION TO ESTABLISH TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT] by Stanley Furniture Company LLC, Stanley Interiors Corporation Deferred Compensation Capital Enhancement Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merritt, Craig)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stanley Interiors Corporation Deferred Compensation Capital Enhancement Plan (Merritt, Craig)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stanley Furniture Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Stanley Furniture Intermediate Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Churchill Downs Holdings LTD, Corporate Parent Six Eagles, Corporate Parent Endurance Capital, Corporate Parent Elms and Severnom, Corporate Parent Nu Advisory for Stanley Furniture Company LLC. (Merritt, Craig)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Thomas Merritt on behalf of Stanley Furniture Company LLC, Stanley Interiors Corporation Deferred Compensation Capital Enhancement Plan (Merritt, Craig)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Electronic Summons Issued as to Stanley Furniture Company LLC and Stanley Interiors Corporation Deferred Compensation Capital Enhancement Plan. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ham)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Proposed Summons for STANLEY INTERIORS CORPORATION DEFERRED COMPENSATION CAPITAL ENHANCEMENT PLAN by Jay N. Busey, Kelly S. Cain, Jesse V. Cannaday, Melvin Clark, Charles William Cubberley, Jr, Calvert Fulcher, Jr, Herman Ellsworth Haley, Jr, John W. Johnson, Dave P. Maddox, John Hart Matthews, Douglas I. Payne, William G. Perdue, William A. Sibbick, Jr, Robert J. Smith, Alexander Teglas, Jr, Robert Anthony Vanore, Larry E. Webb, Jr (Martin, Daniel)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Proposed Summons for Stanley Furniture Company LLC by Jay N. Busey, Kelly S. Cain, Jesse V. Cannaday, Melvin Clark, Charles William Cubberley, Jr, Calvert Fulcher, Jr, Herman Ellsworth Haley, Jr, John W. Johnson, Dave P. Maddox, John Hart Matthews, Douglas I. Payne, William G. Perdue, William A. Sibbick, Jr, Robert J. Smith, Alexander Teglas, Jr, Robert Anthony Vanore, Larry E. Webb, Jr (Martin, Daniel)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RETURN of service of Summons & Complaint on 10/30/2020 upon Supplemental Retirement Plan of Stanley Furniture Co, Registered Agent; Answer due 11/20/2020. (Fishwick, John) Modified on 11/4/2020 - Corrected service date and added answer deadline (ham).
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RETURN of service of Summons & Complaint on 10/30/2020 upon Stone & Leigh, LLC, Registered Agent; Answer due 11/20/2020. (Fishwick, John) Modified on 11/4/2020 - Corrected service date and added answer deadline (ham).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dave P. Maddox, Alexander Teglas, Jr, Calvert Fulcher, Jr, Charles William Cubberley, Jr, Melvin Clark, Jesse V. Cannaday, John Hart Matthews, John W. Johnson, Herman Ellsworth Haley, Jr, Robert Anthony Vanore, Larry E. Webb, Jr, Kelly S. Cain, William G. Perdue, Robert J. Smith, Doug I. Payne, William A. Sibbick, Jr, Jay N. Busey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Martin, Daniel)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Electronic Summons Issued as to Stanley Furniture Company LLC; Stanley Interiors Corporation Deferred Compensation Capital Enhancement Plan; Stone & Leigh, LLC; Supplemental Retirement Plan of Stanley Furniture Company, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ham)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Proposed Summons for SUPPLEMENTAL RETIREMENT PLAN OF STANLEY FURNITURE COMPANY, INC. by Jay N. Busey, Kelly S. Cain, Jesse V. Cannaday, Melvin Clark, Charles William Cubberley, Jr, Calvert Fulcher, Jr, Herman Ellsworth Haley, Jr, John W. Johnson, Dave P. Maddox, John Hart Matthews, Doug I. Payne, William G. Perdue, William A. Sibbick, Jr, Robert J. Smith, Alexander Teglas, Jr, Robert Anthony Vanore, Larry E. Webb, Jr (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Proposed Summons for STONE & LEIGH, LLC by Jay N. Busey, Kelly S. Cain, Jesse V. Cannaday, Melvin Clark, Charles William Cubberley, Jr, Calvert Fulcher, Jr, Herman Ellsworth Haley, Jr, John W. Johnson, Dave P. Maddox, John Hart Matthews, Doug I. Payne, William G. Perdue, William A. Sibbick, Jr, Robert J. Smith, Alexander Teglas, Jr, Robert Anthony Vanore, Larry E. Webb, Jr (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Proposed Summons for STANLEY INTERIORS CORPORATION DEFERRED COMPENSATION CAPITAL ENHANCEMENT PLAN by Jay N. Busey, Kelly S. Cain, Jesse V. Cannaday, Melvin Clark, Charles William Cubberley, Jr, Calvert Fulcher, Jr, Herman Ellsworth Haley, Jr, John W. Johnson, Dave P. Maddox, John Hart Matthews, Doug I. Payne, William G. Perdue, William A. Sibbick, Jr, Robert J. Smith, Alexander Teglas, Jr, Robert Anthony Vanore, Larry E. Webb, Jr (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Proposed Summons for Stanley Furniture Company LLC by Jay N. Busey, Kelly S. Cain, Jesse V. Cannaday, Melvin Clark, Charles William Cubberley, Jr, Calvert Fulcher, Jr, Herman Ellsworth Haley, Jr, John W. Johnson, Dave P. Maddox, John Hart Matthews, Doug I. Payne, William G. Perdue, William A. Sibbick, Jr, Robert J. Smith, Alexander Teglas, Jr, Robert Anthony Vanore, Larry E. Webb, Jr (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Larry E. Webb, Jr (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert Anthony Vanore (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alexander Teglas, Jr (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert J. Smith (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by William A. Sibbick, Jr (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by William G. Perdue (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Doug I. Payne (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Hart Matthews (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dave P. Maddox (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kelly S. Cain (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by John W. Johnson (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jesse V. Cannaday (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jay N. Busey (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Herman Ellsworth Haley, Jr (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Calvert Fulcher, Jr (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charles William Cubberley, Jr (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Melvin Clark (Martin, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stanley Furniture Company LLC, Stanley Interiors Corporation Deferred Compensation Capital Enhancement Plan, Stone & Leigh, LLC, Supplemental Retirement Plan of Stanley Furniture Company, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00; pay.gov receipt number AVAWDC-3515361) filed by Dave P. Maddox, Alexander Teglas, Jr, Calvert Fulcher, Jr, Charles William Cubberley, Jr, Melvin Clark, Jesse V. Cannaday, John Hart Matthews, John W. Johnson, Herman Ellsworth Haley, Jr, Robert Anthony Vanore, Kelly S. Cain, William G. Perdue, Robert J. Smith, Doug I. Payne, William A. Sibbick, Jr, Jay N. Busey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Stanley Furniture Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Smith
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug I. Payne
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William G. Perdue
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly S. Cain
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse V. Cannaday
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Anthony Vanore
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay N. Busey
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry E. Webb, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Teglas, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Sibbick, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles William Cubberley, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Johnson
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Ellsworth Haley, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave P. Maddox
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvert Fulcher, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hart Matthews
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Clark
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas I. Payne
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Martin
Represented By: John Palmer Fishwick, Jr.
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Furniture Company LLC
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Craig Thomas Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supplemental Retirement Plan of Stanley Furniture Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone & Leigh, LLC
Represented By: Richard Andrew Hutchinson
Represented By: J. David Folds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Interiors Corporation Deferred Compensation Capital Enhancement Plan
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Craig Thomas Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?