T. Rowe Price Services, Inc. v. Carter Bank & Trust et al
Plaintiff: T. Rowe Price Services, Inc.
Defendant: The Mane Event, LLC and Carter Bank & Trust
Case Number: 4:2020cv00065
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Carter Bank & Trust. (Gregory, John)
December 18, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment: (CR) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2021 at 02:00 PM via Video Conference before Judge Thomas T. Cullen. (ham)
December 17, 2020 Filing 19 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by T. Rowe Price Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of P. Gregory Williams), #2 Exhibit A to Williams Declaration (Check No. 505), #3 Exhibit 2 (Allan M. Resnick's Affidavit of Unauthorized Distributions), #4 Exhibit 3 (Declaration of Allan M. Resnick), #5 Exhibit 4 (The Mane Event, LLC Information Page and 2020 Annual Report), #6 Exhibit 5 (Declaration of Thomas J. Moran), #7 Exhibit 6 (Acknowledgement, Authorization and Release))(Moran, Thomas)
December 17, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by T. Rowe Price Services, Inc.. (Moran, Thomas)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions Deadline due by 6/21/2021. Status Conference set for 5/17/2021 at 02:00 PM via Conference Call before Judge Thomas T. Cullen (conference call instructions to be emailed to counsel at a later date). Bench Trial set for 9/8/2021 at 09:30 AM in Danville before Judge Thomas T. Cullen. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 12/9/2020. (ham)
December 4, 2020 Filing 16 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (ham)
December 4, 2020 Filing 15 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to The Mane Event, LLC. (Document mailed to Defendant via First Class Mail) (ham)
November 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant The Mane Event, LLC by T. Rowe Price Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Thomas J. Moran), #2 Exhibit 1 to Moran Declaration)(Moran, Thomas)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying Notice (Other) #9 filed by T. Rowe Price Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 11/6/2020. (tob) (Main Document 13 replaced on 11/9/2020) (ham). Modified on 11/9/2020 - Replaced incorrect pdf document with corrected pdf document (ham).
November 6, 2020 Filing 12 Joint Brief/Memorandum of T. Rowe Price Services, Inc. & Carter Bank & Trust in Support of Entry of Freeze Funds Order. filed by T. Rowe Price Services, Inc.. (Moran, Thomas)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T. Rowe Price Services, Inc.. The Mane Event, LLC served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020.(Moran, Thomas)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER: The court directs the parties to file a brief memorandum on the court's authority to order the requested relief (freezing of the contested funds, ECF No. #9 ) in light of Defendant The Mane Event's lack of appearance at this time. Briefs must be filed by 5 p.m. on Friday, 11/6/2020. Entered by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 11/4/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(ham)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by T. Rowe Price Services, Inc. (Proposed Order Freezing Assets) (Moran, Thomas)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carter Bank & Trust (Gregory, John) (Main Document 8 replaced on 11/4/2020) (ham). Modified on 11/4/2020 - Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document (ham).
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Carter Bank & Trust.(Gregory, John)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carter Bank & Trust. Carter Bank & Trust waiver sent on 10/30/2020, answer due 12/29/2020.(Gregory, John)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by T. Rowe Price Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Moran, Thomas)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by T. Rowe Price Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for T. Rowe Price Services, Inc.. (Moran, Thomas)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Requirement to T. Rowe Price Services, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ham)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Carter Bank & Trust and The Mane Event, LLC. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ham)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carter Bank & Trust and The Mane Event, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00; pay.gov receipt number AVAWDC-3530310) filed by T. Rowe Price Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T. Rowe Price Services, Inc. v. Carter Bank & Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mane Event, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Bank & Trust
Represented By: John L. Gregory, III
Represented By: Scott C. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. Rowe Price Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Moran
Represented By: Richard Thomas Pledger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?