Seamster v. Tayler et al
Plaintiff: Dennis D. Seamster
Defendant: Ty Allen Tayler and Blount International, Inc. doing business as Woods Equipment
Case Number: 4:2021cv00021
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 5/28/2021. (ham)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, by Blount International, Inc., Ty Allen Tayler. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Michelle, Brad)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Pulley, Glenn)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions Deadline due by 1/7/2022. Status Conference set for 12/1/2021 at 10:00 AM via Conference Call before Judge Thomas T. Cullen. Jury Trial set for 3/28/2022 - 3/31/2022 at 09:30 AM in Danville before Judge Thomas T. Cullen. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 4/30/2021. (ham)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Paper State Court Records received from Halifax County Circuit Court, CL21-000324-00. (ham)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Wayne Broughton on behalf of Dennis D. Seamster (Broughton, Matthew)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Walthall Pulley on behalf of Dennis D. Seamster (Pulley, Glenn)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Morgan on behalf of Dennis D. Seamster (Morgan, Amanda)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ANSWERS to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - located at Docket Entry #8 State Court Record at pages #14 as to Blount International, Inc. & #19 as to Ty Allen Tayler. (ham)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Halifax County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 4/23/2021. (Order mailed to Halifax County Circuit Court via US Mail)(ham)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (ham)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blount International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ASP Blade Intermediate Holdings, Inc. (ham)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Halifax County Circuit Court, case number CL21-000324-00 (Filing & Administrative fee $402.00; pay.gov Receipt Number AVAWDC-3682143) filed by Ty Allen Tayler and Blount International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, Answer by Blount International, Inc. and Answer by Ty Allen Tayler, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seamster v. Tayler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis D. Seamster
Represented By: Amanda M. Morgan
Represented By: Glenn Walthall Pulley
Represented By: Matthew Wayne Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Allen Tayler
Represented By: John Ryan Owen
Represented By: Brad Michelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blount International, Inc. doing business as Woods Equipment
Represented By: John Ryan Owen
Represented By: Brad Michelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?