Myers v. Brock Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Laura R. Myers
Defendant: Brock Services, LLC and Eastman Chemical Co.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00032
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Steven Stein on behalf of Laura R. Myers (Stein, Michael)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Laura R. Myers. Brock Services, LLC waiver sent on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021.(Traubert, Steven) Modified on 7/7/2021 - corrected waiver sent date and answer due date (ham).
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Laura R. Myers. Eastman Chemical Co. waiver sent on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021.(Traubert, Steven) Modified on 7/7/2021 - corrected waiver sent date and answer due date (ham).
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Laura R. Myers. (ham)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brock Services, LLC & Eastman Chemical Co. (Filing & Administrative fee $402.00; pay.gov Receipt Number AVAWDC-3733030) filed by Laura R. Myers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)
June 25, 2021 Steven M. Traubert, in accordance with Section B.9. of the Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing and Verifying Pleadings and Papers by Electronic Means, a registered user is responsible for ensuring their mailing address, primary email address, and telephone number are kept up-to-date with this court by updating the information in their PACER account. To update your information, log into PACER.gov and click the Maintenance tab to Update this information with this court. (ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Brock Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Chemical Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura R. Myers
Represented By: Steven Michael Traubert
Represented By: Michael Steven Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?