Hensley v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Norman Hensley
Defendant: Monsanto Company and Naturchem, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00020
Filed: March 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 Acknowledgment Email RECEIVED from Northern District of California: Case transferred from Virginia Western has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:22-cv-02298, filed 04/13/2022. (ham)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order transferring case to Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 4/11/2022. (ham)
April 11, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-325) from Northern District of California; MDL No. 2741. (ham)
March 30, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Monsanto Company. (Fishman, Tamara)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Charlotte County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 3/30/2022. (Order mailed to Charlotte County Circuit Court via US Mail) (ham)
March 30, 2022 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Fishman, Tamara)
March 30, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Requirement to Monsanto Company - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ham)
March 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlotte County Circuit Court, case number CL22000001-00 (Filing & Administrative fee $402.00; pay.gov receipt number AVAWDC-3920045) filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Nicholas Hooks, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)
March 30, 2022 Daniel J. Farnsworth, Jr., in accordance with Section B.9. of the Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing and Verifying Pleadings and Papers by Electronic Means, a registered user is responsible for ensuring their mailing address, primary email address, and telephone number are kept up-to-date with this court by #updating the information in their PACER account. To update your information, log into PACER.gov and click the Maintenance tab to Update this information with this court. (ham)
March 30, 2022 Tamara Barago, in accordance with Section B.9. of the Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing and Verifying Pleadings and Papers by Electronic Means, a registered user is responsible for ensuring their mailing address, primary email address, and telephone number are kept up-to-date with this court by #updating the information in their PACER account. To update your information, log into PACER.gov and click the Maintenance tab to Update this information with this court. (ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensley v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Hensley
Represented By: Daniel J. Farnsworth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Tamara Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naturchem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?