Nigro v. Appalachian Osteopathic Postgraduate Training Institute Consortium et al
Plaintiff: Claudine Nigro
Defendant: Appalachian Osteopathic Postgraduate Training Institute Consortium, Virginia Commonwealth University Medical College of Virginia, Francis X. Dennehy, M.D., Warren Memorial Hospital and Valley Health System
Case Number: 5:2009cv00064
Filed: August 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Harrisonburg Office
County: Albemarle
Presiding Judge: Glen E. Conrad
Presiding Judge: B. Waugh Crigler
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/31/2012. (ssm)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/23/10. (kld)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 6/4/10. (krb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nigro v. Appalachian Osteopathic Postgraduate Training Institute Consortium et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudine Nigro
Represented By: Nicholas Harry Hantzes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appalachian Osteopathic Postgraduate Training Institute Consortium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Commonwealth University Medical College of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis X. Dennehy, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?