Pasco v. Zimmerman et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Robert L. Pasco
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Shenandoah County Library, James Dallas Moore, Shenandoah County Library and Hank Zimmerman
Case Number: 5:2011cv00087
Filed: August 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Harrisonburg Office
Presiding Judge: Michael F. Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2012 Filing 33 Notice of Cancellation of Jury Trial
February 7, 2012 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2012 re 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Board of Trustees of the Shenandoah County Library, 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Dallas Moore, 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Shenandoah County Library, 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hank Zimmerman. Court will render an opinion. Case has been taken off the trial docket. (Court Reporter Sonia Ferris.) (jat)
February 7, 2012 Filing 30 NOTICE by Robert L. Pasco of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Certain Claims Against Defendant Zimmerman Only
January 26, 2012 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. filed by Board of Trustees of the Shenandoah County Library.
January 26, 2012 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. filed by Shenandoah County Library.
January 26, 2012 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. filed by Hank Zimmerman.
January 24, 2012 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by James Dallas Moore.
January 20, 2012 Filing 25 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re 9 Brief / Memorandum in Support, 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Defendant Zimmernan. filed by Robert L. Pasco.
January 20, 2012 Filing 24 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re 11 Brief / Memorandum in Support, 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Defendant Library. filed by Robert L. Pasco.
January 20, 2012 Filing 23 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 13 Brief / Memorandum in Support Of Defendant Board. filed by Robert L. Pasco.
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 11 Brief / Memorandum in Support, 9 Brief / Memorandum in Support, 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 8 MOTIONSecond MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 11 Brief / Memorandum in Support, 9 Brief / Memorandum in Support, 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 8 MOTION Responses due by 1/20/2012. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 1/17/2012. (jat)
January 17, 2012 Filing 21 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re 4 MOTION to Dismiss, 5 Brief / Memorandum in Support Of Defendant Moore. filed by Robert L. Pasco.
January 17, 2012 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
January 17, 2012 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 11 Brief / Memorandum in Support, 9 Brief / Memorandum in Support, 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 13 Brief / Memorandum in Support by Robert L. Pasco. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/18-19/2012 09:30 AM in Harrisonburg before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 1/3/2012.
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 4 MOTION to Dismiss, 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Responses due by 1/17/2012. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 12/29/11.
December 27, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 11 Brief / Memorandum in Support, 4 MOTION to Dismiss, 9 Brief / Memorandum in Support, 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 13 Brief / Memorandum in Support, 5 Brief / Memorandum in Support by Robert L. Pasco. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)
December 23, 2011 Filing 15 Scheduling Letter.
December 23, 2011 Filing 14 Magistrate's Notice to counsel.
December 22, 2011 Filing 13 Brief / Memorandum in Support re 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. filed by Board of Trustees of the Shenandoah County Library.
December 22, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Board of Trustees of the Shenandoah County Library.
December 22, 2011 Filing 11 Brief / Memorandum in Support re 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. filed by Shenandoah County Library.
December 22, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Shenandoah County Library.
December 22, 2011 Filing 9 Brief / Memorandum in Support re 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. filed by Hank Zimmerman.
December 22, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hank Zimmerman.
December 19, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing by Attorney for James Dallas Moore re 4 MOTION to Dismiss, 5 Brief / Memorandum in Support Dismissal to be held on 02/07/2012, at 1:00 p.m., at U.S. District Court, Harrisonburg, before Judge Urbanski. Confirmed with U.S. Clerk's Office.
December 9, 2011 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Pasco. Shenandoah County Library served on 12/5/2011, answer due 12/27/2011.
December 7, 2011 Filing 5 Brief / Memorandum in Support re 4 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by James Dallas Moore.
December 7, 2011 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by James Dallas Moore.
November 19, 2011 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Pasco. James Dallas Moore served on 11/16/2011, answer due 12/7/2011.
August 31, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Board of Trustees of the Shenandoah County Library, James Dallas Moore, Shenandoah County Library, Hank Zimmerman.(jat)
August 31, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of Trustees of the Shenandoah County Library, Shenandoah County Library, Hank Zimmerman (Filing fee $ 350.00.), filed by Robert L. Pasco. 100 Day Notice due by 12/9/2011 120 Day Service due by 12/29/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pasco v. Zimmerman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Shenandoah County Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dallas Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenandoah County Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hank Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Pasco
Represented By: Timothy Earl Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?