Nasser v. WhitePages, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael J. Nasser, Sr.
Defendant: WhitePages, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv00097
Filed: September 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Harrisonburg Office
Presiding Judge: B. Waugh Crigler
Presiding Judge: Michael F. Urbanski
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Appeal; adopting 84 Report and Recommendations; granting 85 Motion to Amend/Correct the Record; and further such rulings as set forth in said order. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 7/2/2014. (jat)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 BILL OF COSTS in the amount of $350.00; denying 58 Motion to Dismiss; denying 64 Motion Expenses to Litigate this Matter from 4/21/2010 till 2/4/2014; denying 70 Motion for the U.S. District Court to Refer this Matter to the Supreme Court of Virginia; adopting 73 Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/24/2014. (jat)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/1/14. (kld)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 1/7/2014. (jat)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 11/21/2013. (jat)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER adopting in part rejecting in part 26 Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/23/13. (kld)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying as moot 6 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 15 Motion for Entry of Default; adopting Report and Recommendations re 26 Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 1/14/2013. (jat)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasser v. WhitePages, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WhitePages, Inc.
Represented By: Venkat Balasubramani
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Battle
Represented By: Sean M. McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Nasser, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?