LHF Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-25
Case Number: 5:2016cv00027
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Harrisonburg Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K. Dillon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/20/2019. (jv)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 9/5/2018. (jv)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/2/2016. (jat)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LHF Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?