Voorhees v. Cives Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dennis M. Voorhees
Defendant: Cives Corporation and Michael Keenan
Case Number: 5:2018cv00097
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Harrisonburg Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Jury Trial set for 9/17/2019-9/19/2019 09:30 AM in Harrisonburg before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.), CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 9/10/2018. (jv)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for September 17-19, 2019 at 9:30 AM in Harrisonburg before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. Pretrial Conference set for September 5, 2019 at 2:00 PM in Harrisonburg before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (mf)
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 In Chambers Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon and Magistrate Judge Joel Hoppe: Status Conference held by conference call on 9/5/2018. (bw)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin S. Barlow on behalf of Dennis M. Voorhees (Barlow, Benjamin)
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Rule 16 Status Conference set for September 5, 2018 at 2:00 PM by telephone conference call before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (Chambers will send the dial-in instructions to the parties.)(mf)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 Scheduling Letter (bw)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (kld)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Garrison Meyer, III on behalf of Cives Corporation, Michael Keenan (Meyer, Charles)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cives Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Cives Corporation d/b/a Cives Steel Company, Mid-Atlantic Division for Cives Corporation. (Loughlin, Rachael)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by Cives Corporation, Michael Keenan.(Loughlin, Rachael)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis M. Voorhees. Cives Corporation served on 7/26/2018, answer due 8/16/2018; Michael Keenan served on 7/21/2018, answer due 8/13/2018.(jv)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cives Corporation, Michael Keenan NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cives Corporation, Michael Keenan (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-2940102.), filed by Dennis M. Voorhees. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jv) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2018: #2 Exhibit FLMA issue) (jv). Modified on 7/20/2018 to add exhibit attachment from counsel(jv).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voorhees v. Cives Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis M. Voorhees
Represented By: Ellisleslie Leon Bennett
Represented By: Benjamin Stover Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cives Corporation
Represented By: Charles Garrison Meyer, III
Represented By: Rachael Luzietti Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Keenan
Represented By: Charles Garrison Meyer, III
Represented By: Rachael Luzietti Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?