Virginia Industrial Plastics, Inc. v. Cabinet Saver LLC

Plaintiff: Virginia Industrial Plastics, Inc.
Defendant: Cabinet Saver LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00119
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Jury Trial set for 7/22-24/2019 09:30 AM in Harrisonburg before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs., Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 11/5/18. (mka) Modified on 11/5/2018 to reflect correct referral Judge. (jv). NEF has been regenerated to all parties.
November 5, 2018 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski: Scheduling Conference held on 11/5/2018. (mka)
November 2, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2018 03:00 PM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Dial in instructions emailed to counsel. (mka)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cabinet Saver LLC (Byers, Duncan)
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 Scheduling Letter (mka)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jv)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Filing Requirement to Cabinet Saver LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint #1 , COUNTERCLAIM against Virginia Industrial Plastics, Inc. by Cabinet Saver LLC.(Byers, Duncan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Virginia Industrial Plastics, Inc. (Dickenson, Charles)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cabinet Saver LLC.(jv)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement, by Virginia Industrial Plastics, Inc. (Dickenson, Charles) Modified on 9/14/2018 to reflect correct docket event (jv).
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Requirement to Virginia Industrial Plastics, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by the Clerk (jv)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cabinet Saver LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt# 7-57881.), filed by Virginia Industrial Plastics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. Trademark Certificate)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virginia Industrial Plastics, Inc. v. Cabinet Saver LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabinet Saver LLC
Represented By: Duncan Glover Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Industrial Plastics, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Arthur Evans
Represented By: Charles Jesse Dickenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?