Payne v. EchoHill Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Selina Payne
Defendant: Peter Lawrence, Right At Home, LLC and EchoHill Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00059
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleadings by EchoHill Enterprises, Inc., Peter Lawrence. (Green, Cameron)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Oral ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint EchoHill Enterprises, Inc. answer due 11/5/2019; Peter Lawrence answer due 11/5/2019; Right At Home, LLC answer due 11/5/2019 by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/14/19. (mka)
October 14, 2019 Filing 16 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleadings (Agreed) by Right At Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKenna, Joan)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Oral ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Right At Home, LLC answer due 10/15/2019; granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint EchoHill Enterprises, Inc. answer due 10/15/2019; Peter Lawrence answer due 10/15/2019.. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/26/19. (mka)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by EchoHill Enterprises, Inc., Peter Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Cameron)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleadings (Agreed) by Right At Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKenna, Joan)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. EchoHill Enterprises, Inc. answer due 9/26/2019; Peter Lawrence answer due 9/26/2019.. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/13/2019. (jv)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jv)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleadings by EchoHill Enterprises, Inc., Peter Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Cameron)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by EchoHill Enterprises, Inc. (Green, Cameron)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Oral ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleadings Right At Home, LLC answer due 9/24/2019 by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/10/19. (mka)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Right At Home, LLC identifying Corporate Parent RiseMark Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Investors Management Corp., Corporate Parent RiseMark Brands for Right At Home, LLC. (McKenna, Joan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Requirement to Right At Home, LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleadings by Right At Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKenna, Joan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Echohill Enterprises and Peter Lawrence on 8/22/2019. EchoHill Enterprises, Inc. answer due 9/12/2019; Peter Lawrence answer due 9/12/2019.(jv)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Right At Home, LLC served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019.(jv)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to EchoHill Enterprises, Inc., Peter Lawrence, Right At Home, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EchoHill Enterprises, Inc., Peter Lawrence, Right At Home, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3207865.), filed by Selina Payne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. EchoHill Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selina Payne
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Represented By: Timothy Lawrence Coffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Lawrence
Represented By: Sarah Aiman Belger
Represented By: Cameron Elizabeth Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Right At Home, LLC
Represented By: Joan C. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EchoHill Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Aiman Belger
Represented By: Cameron Elizabeth Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?