Murphy v. Compton et al
Plaintiff: Ethel M. Murphy
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Alyssa B. Compton
Case Number: 5:2019cv00063
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(de Witt, Alexander)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jv)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Registered Agent for defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on September 11, 2019, filed by Ethel M. Murphy.(Basilone, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethel M. Murphy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Commissioner of DMV, #2 Exhibit Affidavit to Commissioner of DMV, #3 Exhibit Signed Green Card)(Basilone, John)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Ethel M. Murphy as to Alyssa B. Compton.(Basilone, John)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORAL ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney James N. Riley for Ethel M. Murphy added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 10/10/2019. (jv)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for James N. Riley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3246455. by Ethel M. Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Basilone, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (de Witt, Alexander)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Requirement to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company answer due 10/23/2019.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 10/1/2019. (jv)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(de Witt, Alexander)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alyssa B. Compton, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alyssa B. Compton, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt number 0423-3217251.), filed by Ethel M. Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Compton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa B. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel M. Murphy
Represented By: John Edward Basilone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?