Rodriguez v. Woodson et al
Plaintiff: Sherry Rodriguez
Defendant: Other John and Jane Doe Augusta Correctional Center (ACC) and VA. DOC Officials, and Craigsville, Augusta County, Virginia Law Enforcement Officials, C.O. Ryder, C.O. Hale, C.O. Head, Sgt. Benjamin J. Lokey and Warden John A. Woodson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00066
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Roseboro Notice re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Deadline set for 11/14/2019. (kld)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (kld)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by C.O. Hale, C.O. Head, Benjamin J. Lokey, C.O. Ryder, John A. Woodson. (Vorhis, Richard)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by C.O. Hale, C.O. Head, Benjamin J. Lokey, C.O. Ryder, John A. Woodson. (Vorhis, Richard)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Carson Vorhis on behalf of C.O. Hale, C.O. Head, Benjamin J. Lokey, C.O. Ryder, John A. Woodson (Vorhis, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherry Rodriguez. John A. Woodson served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019.(jv)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherry Rodriguez. C.O. Ryder served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019.(jv)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherry Rodriguez. Benjamin J. Lokey served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019.(jv)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherry Rodriguez. C.O. Head served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019.(jv)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherry Rodriguez. C.O. Hale served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019.(jv)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to C.O. Hale, C.O. Head, Benjamin J. Lokey, C.O. Ryder, John A. Woodson.(jv)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.O. Hale, C.O. Head, Benjamin J. Lokey, Other John and Jane Doe Augusta Correctional Center (ACC) and VA. DOC Officials, and Craigsville, Augusta County, Virginia Law Enforcement Officials, C.O. Ryder, John A. Woodson (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt #300003515.), filed by Sherry Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Woodson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other John and Jane Doe Augusta Correctional Center (ACC) and VA. DOC Officials, and Craigsville, Augusta County, Virginia Law Enforcement Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Ryder
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Hale
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Head
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Benjamin J. Lokey
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden John A. Woodson
Represented By: Richard Carson Vorhis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?