BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Darnell
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: Michael Darnell
Case Number: 5:2019cv00079
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michael Darnell (kld)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Michael Darnell by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Toepp, Alison)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. Michael Darnell served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019.(Toepp, Alison)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Michael Darnell NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by BMO Harris Bank N.A. as to All Plaintiffs.(Toepp, Alison)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMO Harris Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BMO Financial Corp., Corporate Parent the Bank of Montreal for BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (jv)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Darnell (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3261124.), filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. loan and security agreement, #3 Exhibit B. Continuing Guaranty, #4 Exhibit C. Notice of Default)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Darnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Darnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: Alison Ross Wickizer Toepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?