TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC v. INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Plaintiff: TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC
Defendant: Innovative Refrigeration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00087
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. § 183
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ANSWER to #19 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baugher, Andrew)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #29 MOTION to Strike Certain of Defendant's Alleged Affirmative Defenses . filed by TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC. (Baugher, Andrew)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Strike Certain of Defendant's Alleged Affirmative Defenses by TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC. (Baugher, Andrew)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Defendant's Counterclaim. TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC answer due 1/9/2020.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/23/19. (kld)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #19 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baugher, Andrew)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Notice of Correction: Documents #22 MOTION for Elizabeth M.C. Scheibel to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #23 MOTION for Daniel M. Lechleiter to Appear Pro Hac Vice were replaced to correct typos within the documents. (jv)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Elizabeth M.C. Scheibel for TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC added. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/13/2019. (jv)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daniel M. Lechleiter for TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC added. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/13/2019. (jv)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Daniel M. Lechleiter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3289617. by TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baugher, Andrew) (Main Document 23 replaced on 12/13/2019) (jv).
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Elizabeth M.C. Scheibel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3289520. by TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baugher, Andrew) (Main Document 22 replaced on 12/13/2019) (jv).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORAL ORDER granting #20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joshua Aaron Glikin for Innovative Refrigeration Systems, Inc. added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/5/19. (kld)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Joshua A. Glikin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3282789. by Innovative Refrigeration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bailey, Schyler)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC by Innovative Refrigeration Systems, Inc..(Bailey, Schyler)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC (Baugher, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Innovative Refrigeration Systems, Inc., filed by TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Baugher, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Baugher on behalf of TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC (Baugher, Andrew)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Filing Requirement to TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jv)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-02913. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DEFENDANTS MOTION AND STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE (ECF NO. #9 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID MOTION AND STIPULATION ARE GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: (1) PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(A), THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA; AND, (2) THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/13/2019.11/14/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #10 ) IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 11/14/2019, TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/1/2019.11/4/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BUTLER, DENNIS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC..Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. McGinnis, Jr., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BUTLER, DENNIS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC. WILL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 31, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/16/19. 10/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC..Certificate of Service.(BUTLER, DENNIS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN D. SIMMONS on behalf of INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SIMMONS, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIS JAMES BUTLER on behalf of INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUTLER, DENNIS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Deborah Cairns re: served Summons upon Joshua A. Glikin on 09/26/19, answer due 10/17/2019. (GREY, FRANCIS) Modified on 9/30/2019 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC.(GREY, FRANCIS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 8,783,047 & 9,297,570. (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.] (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/15/2019) (jv). Modified on 11/15/2019 to flatten document (jv).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 199921.), filed by TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC.(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC.. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/5/2019 (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Eligible for Arbitration(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC. (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC v. INNOVATIVE REFRIGERATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Refrigeration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Simmons
Represented By: Dennis J. Butler
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Glikin
Represented By: Schyler Ann Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIPPMANN ENGINEERING, LLC
Represented By: Francis J. Grey
Represented By: Elizabeth M.C. Scheibel
Represented By: Daniel M. Lechleiter
Represented By: Andrew S. Baugher
Represented By: Patrick C. Asplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?