Seiden v. Omni Hotels Management Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Seiden
Defendant: Omni Hotels Management Corporation, Omni Homestead, Inc., The Homestead LC and Segtown, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00567
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00526. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 19, 2019 Case electronically transferred to District of Western District of Virginia, Harrisonburg Division. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM ORDER - the Court GRANTS the motion (ECF 6) and TRANSFERS this case to the Western District of Virginia, Harrisonburg Division. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 09/19/2019. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Omni Hotels Management Corporation, The Homestead, L.C.. (Mackey, Eli) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia, Harrisonburg Division filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation, The Homestead, L.C.. (Mackey, Eli) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER- This matter comes before the Court on the plaintiffs motion for extension of time to respond to the defendants' motion to transfer venue. (Dk. No. 6.) Upon due consideration, the Court GRANTS the motion. The plaintiffs opposition to the defendants' motion to transfer venue is deemed FILED as of August 9, 2019. (See Dk. No. 7.). Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 08/12/2019. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia, Harrisonburg Division, #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia, Harrisonburg Division, #3 Memorandum in Support, filed by Jennifer Seiden. (Quinn, Colleen) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia, Harrisonburg Division, #3 Memorandum in Support, by Jennifer Seiden. (Quinn, Colleen) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Omni Hotels Management Corporation, The Homestead, L.C..(Mackey, Eli) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Omni Hotels Management Corporation, The Homestead, L.C.. (Mackey, Eli) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Notice of Correction re [1-2] Financial Disclosure. The filing user has been notified to refile the document as it's own separate event. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia, Harrisonburg Division filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation, The Homestead, L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Google map, #2 Exhibit Contract)(Mackey, Eli) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia, Harrisonburg Division by Omni Hotels Management Corporation, The Homestead, L.C.. (Mackey, Eli) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/20/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6753758.), filed by The Homestead, L.C., Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Financial Disclosure, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Complaint and Discovery Served in State Court, #5 Exhibit First Consent Motion to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleadings, #6 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleadings, #7 Exhibit Motion for Entry of Nonsuit, #8 Exhibit Nonsuit Order Dismissing Omni Homestead, Inc. & Segtown, LLC, #9 Exhibit Second Consent Motion to Enlarge Time to File Responsive Pleadings, #10 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Mackey, Eli) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/24/2019) (tjoh, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seiden v. Omni Hotels Management Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Hotels Management Corporation
Represented By: Eli Jason Scott Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Homestead, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Homestead LC
Represented By: Eli Jason Scott Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Segtown, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Seiden
Represented By: Katherine Lee Miceli
Represented By: Colleen Marea Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?