Draper v. County of Augusta, VA et al
Plaintiff: Cedrick Euron Draper
Defendant: Augusta County General District Court, Commonwealth of Virginia Augusta County Sheriff Office, County of Augusta, VA, Commonwealth of Virginia and Commonwealth of Virginia Commonwealth Atty Office
Case Number: 5:2020cv00015
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Cedrick Euron Draper. USCA Case Number 20-1307. Case Manager: Emily Borneisen. (jv)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 DUPLICATE NOTICE of #5 PRO SE NOTICE OF APPEAL by Cedrick Euron Draper received in Roanoke Division (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jv)
March 16, 2020 Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #5 Notice of Appeal (jv) Modified on 3/16/2020 NEF notice mailed to Mr. Draper this day(jv).
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA re #5 PRO SE Notice of Appeal as to #3 Order Dismissing Case NOTE: The Docketing Statement and Transcript Order Form are available on the 4th Circuit Court of Appeals website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov. If CJA24 form(s) are applicable, you must submit a separate Auth-24 for each court reporter from whom you wish to order a transcript through the District Court's eVoucher system. (jv)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order Dismissing Case by Cedrick Euron Draper. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jv)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 Answer to Dismissal filed by Cedrick Euron Draper. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jv)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/4/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(jv)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Augusta County General District Court, Commonwealth of Virginia, Commonwealth of Virginia Augusta County Sheriff Office, Commonwealth of Virginia Commonwealth Atty Office, County of Augusta, VA, filed by Cedrick Euron Draper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(jv)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cedrick Euron Draper. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draper v. County of Augusta, VA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedrick Euron Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta County General District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Virginia Augusta County Sheriff Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Augusta, VA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Virginia Commonwealth Atty Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?