Scarborough v. Frederick County Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: Christie Scarborough
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Frederick County Public Schools
Case Number: 5:2020cv00069
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 . filed by Frederick County Public Schools. (Bardot, Heather)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (Notice mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(jv)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00738. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 14, 2020 Case transferred to District of Western District of Virginia. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the Court FINDS that the interest of justice supports transferring this case to the Western District of Virginia. Accordingly, the Court DENIES Frederick County Public Schools' motion to dismiss and TRANSFERS this case to the Western District of Virginia. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 10/14/2020. Copy to plaintiff as directed. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Opposition to #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christie Scarborough. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue with Roseboro,. filed by Frederick County Public Schools. (Bardot, Heather) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue with Roseboro,. by Frederick County Public Schools. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Kathleen Bardot on behalf of Frederick County Public Schools (Bardot, Heather) (Main Document 3 replaced by Clerk with non-fillable form on 10/2/2020) (jsmi, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Frederick County Public Schools. Clerk mailed summons to plaintiff for service. (asho, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/15/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTION against Frederick County Public Schools ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt no. 34683048329), filed by Christie Scarborough. Attachment on 9/18/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (asho, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2020: #2 Receipt) (asho, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarborough v. Frederick County Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick County Public Schools
Represented By: Heather Kathleen Bardot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?