J.I.P. et al v. Shaner
Plaintiff: J.I.P., Maria Bonilla, Teodora Benitez-Palacios and Eric Vallecillo
Defendant: Debora Leigh Shaner and Fredis A. Bonilla
Case Number: 5:2021cv00012
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 17 Clerks Entry of Dismissal without prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (jv)
March 19, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT by Teodora Benitez-Palacios, Maria Bonilla, J.I.P., Eric Vallecillo (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Action Without Prejudice)(Dix, Mark)
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)
March 11, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Lee Rathlev on behalf of Debora Leigh Shaner (Rathlev, Christopher)
March 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Dennis Dix on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dix, Mark)
March 10, 2021 Mark D. Dix, Esq., in accordance with Section B.9. of the Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing and Verifying Pleadings and Papers by Electronic Means, a registered user is responsible for ensuring their mailing address, primary email address, and telephone number are kept up-to-date with this court by updating the information in their PACER account. To update your information, log into PACER.gov and click the Maintenance tab to Update this information with this court. (jv)
February 17, 2021 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-05049. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 17, 2021 Filing 11 Letter to Judge Frederic Block by Maria Bonilla (Nichols, Regina) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC Order Dismissing: Defendant Fredis A. Bonilla, only. Plaintiff has agreed to withdraw her claims as to this defendant in a conference held before J. Block on February 10, 2021. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 2/17/2021. (Innelli, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: Transferring this case to the Western District of Virginia as agreed upon by the plaintiff and defendant Shaner in a telephone conference held before J. Block on February 10, 2021. The agreement is further confirmed in plaintiff's letter #11 . The case is stayed for 30 days to allow plaintiff to obtain counsel in the Western District of Virginia. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 2/17/2021. (Innelli, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Case transferred to District of Western District of Virginia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 2/17/2021. (Innelli, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
February 10, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Robert Horn, Esq. for the plaintiff, Rebecca Rosedale, Esq. for defendant Shaner and Steven Weissler, Esq. for defendant Bonilla, all present. Telephone pre-motion conference held on 2/10/21. Defendant Shaners anticipated motion to dismiss was discussed. The plaintiff will withdraw the complaint without prejudice as to defendant Bonilla, so he can file an action is State Court. Plaintiff will then move by letter brief to transfer this case to the Federal Court in Virginia. By February 17, 2021 counsel shall file a letter with their agreed upon briefing schedule as to their letter briefs transferring this case to Federal Court in Virginia. (Court Reporter: Not Reported.) (Innelli, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for February 3, 2021 by Debora Leigh Shaner. (Rosedale, Rebecca) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/10/2021 04:00 PM before Judge Frederic Block. (Innelli, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant Shaner's letter application #10 dated 1/19/21, with the consent of other counsel is GRANTED. The telephone pre-motion conference scheduled for February 3, 2021 is adjourned to February 10, 2021 at 4:00 P.M. All parties are directed to call 877-336-1839 then enter access code 7543641 at the time of the telephone pre-motion conference . Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the new date and time of this telephone pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/19/2021. (Innelli, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant Debora Leigh Shaner's letter application #8 dated 12/14/20 is GRANTED. A telephone pre motion conference is scheduled for February 3, 2021 @ 3:00PM. All parties are directed to call 877-336-1839 then enter access code 7543641 at the time of the telephone pre-motion conference . Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephone pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/14/2021. (Innelli, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference or issuance of briefing schedule in anticipation of filing a motion to dismiss by Debora Leigh Shaner. (Rosedale, Rebecca) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca June Rosedale on behalf of Debora Leigh Shaner (aty to be noticed) (Rosedale, Rebecca) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Debora Leigh Shaner by Fredis A. Bonilla. (Weissler, Steven) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
November 11, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.I.P.. Fredis A. Bonilla served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Nichols, Regina) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. Additionally, case is reassigned to Office Code 1: Brooklyn as per civil cover sheet Rule 50.1(d)(2). (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fredis A. Bonilla, Debora Leigh Shaner Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by J.I.P., Teodora Benitez-Palacios, Eric Vallecillo, Maria Bonilla. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
October 21, 2020 FILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-13557627 (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Incorrect Document Entry Information. The Main Document in Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons) was filed as one document. Documents were separated and re-entered as the Main Document and attachments in Document Entry No. 1. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.I.P. et al v. Shaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.I.P.
Represented By: Mark Dennis Dix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Bonilla
Represented By: Mark Dennis Dix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teodora Benitez-Palacios
Represented By: Mark Dennis Dix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Vallecillo
Represented By: Mark Dennis Dix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debora Leigh Shaner
Represented By: Christopher Lee Rathlev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredis A. Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?