Doe v. Rockingham County School Board et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Rockingham County School Board doing business as Russel County Public Schools, Phil Judd, Sandy King, Wesley Dunlap, Timeless Toys, LLC and John Roes 1-10
Case Number: 5:2021cv00051
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Doe's Response due by 5:00 pm 9/23/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 9/3/2021. (jv)
September 2, 2021 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Laughlin, Laura)
September 2, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Laughlin on behalf of John Doe (Laughlin, Laura)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #4 Motion Use of Pseudonym. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 08/27/2021. (ck)
August 27, 2021 Filing 28 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Phil Judd, Sandy King, Rockingham County School Board. (Bardot, Heather)
August 27, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Phil Judd, Sandy King, Rockingham County School Board. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather)
August 25, 2021 Filing 26 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Timeless Toys, LLC. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
August 25, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Timeless Toys, LLC. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
August 25, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION Use of Pseudonym . filed by Phil Judd, Sandy King, Rockingham County School Board. (Bardot, Heather)
August 20, 2021 Filing 23 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)
August 10, 2021 Filing 22 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Timeless Toys, LLC (Schnetzler, Nathan)
August 10, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Filing Requirement to Timeless Toys, LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORAL ORDER granting Defendant Timeless Toys, LLC's consent motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 19). Defendant must file its responsive pleading on or before Wednesday, August 25, 2021. Defendant must also file an opposition or notice of non-opposition to Plaintiff's motion for use of pseudonym on or before August 25, 2021. Entered by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 8/10/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(jv)
August 10, 2021 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Timeless Toys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)
August 10, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Henry Schnetzler on behalf of Timeless Toys, LLC (Schnetzler, Nathan)
August 10, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean C. Workowski on behalf of Timeless Toys, LLC (Workowski, Sean)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORAL ORDER granting Defendants Rockingham County School Board, Phil Judd, and Sandy King's ("Defendants") unopposed motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 15). Defendants shall file their responsive pleading(s) on or before Friday, August 27, 2021. Defendants shall also file an opposition or notice of non-opposition to Plaintiff's motion for use of pseudonym on or before Friday, August 27, 2021. The court will take up Plaintiff's motion for use of pseudonym once all defendants have entered appearances and filed their responsive pleadings. Entered by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 8/10/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(jv)
August 9, 2021 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Phil Judd, Sandy King, Rockingham County School Board. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather)
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Motion Presudonym, Brief ISO, Pro Hac Motion served on Wesley Dunlap on 07/29/2021, filed by John Doe.(Fitzgerald, Andrew)
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Motion Presudonym, Brief ISO, Pro Hac Motion served on Timeless Toys, LLC on 07/20/2021, filed by John Doe.(Fitzgerald, Andrew)
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Motion Presudonym, Brief ISO, Pro Hac Motion served on Sandy King on 07/20/2021, filed by John Doe.(Fitzgerald, Andrew)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Motion Presudonym, Brief ISO, Pro Hac Motion served on Rockingham County School Board on 07/20/2021, filed by John Doe.(Fitzgerald, Andrew)
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Motion Presudonym, Brief ISO, Pro Hac Motion served on Phil Judd on 07/20/2021, filed by John Doe.(Fitzgerald, Andrew)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Kathleen Bardot on behalf of Phil Judd, Sandy King, Rockingham County School Board (Bardot, Heather)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Oral ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Laura E. Laughlin. Entered by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 7/16/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(jv)
July 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Laura E. Laughlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3746841. by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Fitzgerald, Andrew)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION Use of Pseudonym . filed by John Doe. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wesley Dunlap, Phil Judd, Sandy King, Rockingham County School Board, Timeless Toys, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(kld)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION Use of Pseudonym by John Doe. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
July 15, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by John Doe (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Proposed Summons, #2 Summons Issued Proposed Summons, #3 Summons Issued Proposed Summons, #4 Summons Issued Proposed Summons)(Fitzgerald, Andrew)
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Timeless Toys, LLC, Wesley Dunlap, Phil Judd, Rockingham County School Board, and Sandy King by John Doe (kld)
July 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wesley Dunlap, Phil Judd, Sandy King, Rockingham County School Board, John Roes 1-10, Timeless Toys, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402, receipt number AVAWDC-3746227.), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Rockingham County School Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Andrew L. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Laura Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockingham County School Board doing business as Russel County Public Schools
Represented By: Heather Kathleen Bardot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Judd
Represented By: Heather Kathleen Bardot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy King
Represented By: Heather Kathleen Bardot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timeless Toys, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Represented By: Sean C. Workowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roes 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?