Liggins v. Zion Baptist Church et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Liggins
Defendant: Zion Baptist Church, Pastor Karlyle Hill, Deacon Steve Washington, Deacon Otis Harper, Sr., Curtis Liggins, Nicol Hill and Deacon Joseph Tansimore
Case Number: 5:2021cv00058
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO SE MOTION to Dismiss #6 MOTION for Sanctions by Kenneth D. Liggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C)(jv)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRO SE MOTION for Default Judgment as to Otis Harper, Sr, Karlyle Hill, Nicol Hill, Curtis Liggins, Joseph Tansimore, Steve Washington, Zion Baptist Church by Kenneth D. Liggins. (jv)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRO SE RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF. filed by Kenneth D. Liggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. No Trespass Notice)(jv)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (Notice mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(jv)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Roseboro Notice re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF as to Kenneth D. Liggins. Deadline set for 10/12/2021. (Notice mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(jv)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Sanctions by Otis Harper, Sr, Karlyle Hill, Nicol Hill, Curtis Liggins, Joseph Tansimore, Steve Washington, Zion Baptist Church. (Hill, Andrew)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Otis Harper, Sr, Karlyle Hill, Nicol Hill, Curtis Liggins, Joseph Tansimore, Steve Washington, Zion Baptist Church. (Hill, Andrew)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Paul Hill on behalf of All Defendants (Hill, Andrew)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Otis Harper, Sr, Karlyle Hill, Nicol Hill, Curtis Liggins, Joseph Tansimore, Steve Washington, Zion Baptist Church.(jv)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRO SE Initial Memorandum of Lis Pendens Lien filed by Kenneth D. Liggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2. Berryville, VA Property Records)(jv)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Otis Harper, Sr, Karlyle Hill, Nicol Hill, Curtis Liggins, Joseph Tansimore, Steve Washington, Zion Baptist Church (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402, receipt #500003315.), filed by Kenneth D. Liggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. No Trespass Notice, #2 Exhibit 3. Declaration from Mr. Liggins, #3 Exhibit 4. Declaration from Mr. Nelson, #4 Exhibit 5. Declaration from Ms. Ligons, #5 Exhibit 6., #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liggins v. Zion Baptist Church et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Liggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zion Baptist Church
Represented By: Andrew Paul Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pastor Karlyle Hill
Represented By: Andrew Paul Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deacon Steve Washington
Represented By: Andrew Paul Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deacon Otis Harper, Sr.
Represented By: Andrew Paul Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Liggins
Represented By: Andrew Paul Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicol Hill
Represented By: Andrew Paul Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deacon Joseph Tansimore
Represented By: Andrew Paul Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?