BLM Of The Shenandoah Valley, LLC et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: BLM Of The Shenandoah Valley, LLC, Cameron Turley, Bonnie Jo Chapman, Michael Phillips, Cortez Nathan, Stephen Nelson, Mckenzie McQueary, Antwhon Suiter, Ishmael Barrios and Dylan Jorgensen
Defendant: Donald L. Smith, Timothy Martin and Augusta County, VA
Case Number: 5:2021cv00060
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Referring Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (CR) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) and Rule 16 Status Conference ----- Motion Hearing set for December 6, 2021 at 2:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (The parties anticipate needing 2 hours for this hearing.)(mf) Modified on 10/8/2021 to extend the anticipate length of the hearing (mf).
October 6, 2021 Filing 17 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)
October 5, 2021 Filing 16 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Timothy Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Public Statement)(Stubblefield, Emily)
October 5, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Timothy Martin. (Stubblefield, Emily)
October 5, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Kristin Stubblefield on behalf of Timothy Martin (Stubblefield, Emily)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with corrected title of document. filed by Donald L. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fessier, Rosalie)
October 1, 2021 Filing 12 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Donald L. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fessier, Rosalie)
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Donald L. Smith. (Fessier, Rosalie)
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Augusta County, VA. (Stubblefield, Emily)
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Augusta County, VA. (Stubblefield, Emily)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Kristin Stubblefield on behalf of Augusta County, VA (Stubblefield, Emily)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosalie Pemberton Fessier on behalf of Donald L. Smith (Fessier, Rosalie)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas T. Cullen no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 9/10/2021. (jv)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support by BLM Of The Shenandoah Valley, LLC, Ishmael Barrios, Dylan Jorgensen, Mckenzie McQueary, Cortez Nathan, Stephen Nelson, Michael Phillips, Antwhon Suiter, Cameron Turley. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration)(Okay, Christopher)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, Verifications by Ishmael Barrios, Bonnie Jo Chapman, Dylan Jorgensen, Mckenzie McQueary, Cortez Nathan, Stephen Nelson, Michael Phillips, Antwhon Suiter, Cameron Turley (Okay, Christopher)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Augusta County, VA, Timothy Martin, Donald L. Smith NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLM Of The Shenandoah Valley, LLC (jv)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Augusta County, VA, Timothy Martin, Donald L. Smith (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402, receipt number AVAWDC-3784594.), filed by Stephen Nelson, Cameron Turley, Michael Phillips, Cortez Nathan, Ishmael Barrios, Antwhon Suiter, BLM Of The Shenandoah Valley, LLC, Dylan Jorgensen, Mckenzie McQueary, Bonnie Jo Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLM Of The Shenandoah Valley, LLC et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLM Of The Shenandoah Valley, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Michael Okay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Turley
Represented By: Christopher Michael Okay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Jo Chapman
Represented By: Christopher Michael Okay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Phillips
Represented By: Christopher Michael Okay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortez Nathan
Represented By: Christopher Michael Okay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Nelson
Represented By: Christopher Michael Okay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mckenzie McQueary
Represented By: Christopher Michael Okay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwhon Suiter
Represented By: Christopher Michael Okay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ishmael Barrios
Represented By: Christopher Michael Okay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Jorgensen
Represented By: Christopher Michael Okay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald L. Smith
Represented By: Rosalie Pemberton Fessier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Martin
Represented By: Emily Kristin Stubblefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta County, VA
Represented By: Emily Kristin Stubblefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?