MCBRIDE v. U.S.A. LOGISTICS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KATHY MCBRIDE
Defendant: U.S.A. LOGISTICS, INC., LEWIS T NEWBILL and JOHN DOES 1-10
Case Number: 5:2022cv00039
Filed: June 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:21-cv-12279. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER Transferring this matter to the Western District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 6/22/2022. (jal, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
June 22, 2022 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jal, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
June 21, 2022 Filing 13 Proposed Order by LEWIS T NEWBILL, U.S.A. LOGISTICS, INC.. (MONTGOMERY, SUZANNE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER that in light of Plaintiff's acceptance of Defendant' representations as to its contacts with New Jersey as set forth in her opposition #10 to the Motion to Dismiss, and her alternative request to transfer this matter to the Western District of Virginia, counsel are hereby instructed to meet and confer; by no later than 03/15/2022, either the parties shall file a consent order for the transfer of the matter to Virginia or Defendants shall submit a letter brief setting forth their objections to the transfer. In the meantime, the Clerks Office is hereby instructed to administratively terminate the Motion to Dismiss #4 pending the parties' submission(s). So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 03/01/2022. (Gonzalez, P) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
November 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT ORDER granting request nunc pro tunc; Plaintiff is permitted to file a Response Dismiss the Complaint on 9/03/2021. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 11/13/2021. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition filed by KATHY MCBRIDE re #4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(POPP, LAWRENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion filed by KATHY MCBRIDE re #4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (POPP, LAWRENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion filed by KATHY MCBRIDE re #4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (POPP, LAWRENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's opposition to pending Motion to Dismiss to be filed no later than 8/20/2021. Defendant's reply papers to be filed no later than 8/31/2021. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 7/26/2021. (kas) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
July 26, 2021 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Telephone Conference held on 7/26/2021. (kas) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Conference call is hereby scheduled for 7/26/2021 at 10:00 a.m Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 7/21/2021. (kas) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Plaintiff req adjn of motion re #4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (POPP, LAWRENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by LEWIS T NEWBILL, U.S.A. LOGISTICS, INC.. Responses due by 7/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit)(MONTGOMERY, SUZANNE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 8/2/2021 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Zahid N. Quraishi for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/24/2021. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LEWIS T NEWBILL, U.S.A. LOGISTICS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
June 9, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
June 9, 2021 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
June 9, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jal, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12530914) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KATHY MCBRIDE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(POPP, LAWRENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/22/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCBRIDE v. U.S.A. LOGISTICS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY MCBRIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.A. LOGISTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEWIS T NEWBILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?