Laisure v. Winchester Anesthesiologists, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Beth Laisure
Defendant: Winchester Anesthesiologists, Inc. and Winchester Medical Center
Case Number: 5:2022cv00054
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Filing 15 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 Brief / Memorandum in Support, #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for willful and wanton negligence, negligence per se, and agency . filed by Beth Laisure. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doc 41, Sowers v. USA, Bench Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Doc 44, Sowers v. USA, Memorandum Opinion)(Ford, Cory)
November 15, 2022 Filing 14 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)
November 15, 2022 Filing 13 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Winchester Anesthesiologists, Inc. (Mitchell, Byron)
November 15, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Winchester Anesthesiologists, Inc.. (Mitchell, Byron)
November 15, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Winchester Anesthesiologists, Inc..(Mitchell, Byron)
November 11, 2022 Filing 10 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Winchester Medical Center identifying Corporate Parent Valley Health System for Winchester Medical Center. (Vieth, Brian)
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Filing Requirement to Winchester Medical Center - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)
November 7, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Winchester Medical Center.(Vieth, Brian)
November 7, 2022 Filing 7 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for willful and wanton negligence, negligence per se, and agency . filed by Winchester Medical Center. (Vieth, Brian)
November 7, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for willful and wanton negligence, negligence per se, and agency by Winchester Medical Center. (Vieth, Brian)
October 5, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Winchester Anesthesiologists, Inc., Winchester Medical Center NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
October 5, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Winchester Medical Center by Beth Laisure (Ford, Cory) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/5/2022) (jv). Modified on 10/5/2022 Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document(jv).
October 5, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Winchester Anesthesiologists, Inc. by Beth Laisure (Ford, Cory) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/5/2022) (jv). Modified on 10/5/2022 Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document(jv).
September 27, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Ashby Pentony on behalf of Beth Laisure (Pentony, Peter)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Winchester Anesthesiologists, Inc., Winchester Medical Center (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-4037868.), filed by Beth Laisure. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laisure v. Winchester Anesthesiologists, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Laisure
Represented By: Cory Richard Ford
Represented By: Peter Ashby Pentony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester Anesthesiologists, Inc.
Represented By: Byron James Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester Medical Center
Represented By: Brian Ballard Vieth
Represented By: Robyn Page Ayres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?