Insurance Company of the West v. Boxes N Bags, Inc.
Plaintiff: Insurance Company of the West
Defendant: Boxes N Bags, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2024cv00024
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Boxes N Bags, Inc. answer due 8/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 6/10/24. (kld)
June 10, 2024 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Insurance Company of the West. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Zuk, Peter)
June 10, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Insurance Company of the West. Boxes N Bags, Inc. served on 5/21/2024, answer due 6/11/2024.(Zuk, Peter)
May 7, 2024 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Boxes N Bags, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
May 6, 2024 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent ICW Group Holdings, Inc. by Insurance Company of the West. (jv)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boxes N Bags, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 405 receipt number AVAWDC-4421583.), filed by Insurance Company of the West. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A., #3 Exhibit B., #4 Exhibit C.)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Insurance Company of the West v. Boxes N Bags, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Insurance Company of the West
Represented By: Peter Nicholas Yarosl Zuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boxes N Bags, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?