Mawyer v. State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Jeff Mawyer
Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2024cv00029
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James Huntington Odom, III on behalf of Jeff Mawyer (Odom, James) (Main Document 12 replaced on 6/11/2024 with flattened pdf version.) (ca)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORAL ORDER granting #10 MOTION for James Huntington Odom, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 6/7/2024. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(jv)
June 6, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for James Huntington Odom, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-4443439. by Jeff Mawyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, John)
June 5, 2024 Filing 9 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (kld)
June 4, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Simpson on behalf of Jeff Mawyer (Simpson, John) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/5/2024) (kld). Modified on 6/5/2024 Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document (kld).
May 28, 2024 Filing 7 Certified True Paper Copies of State Court Record(s) received from Augusta County Circuit Court, case number(s) CL24001037-00 (Records available for viewing in the clerks office.) (jv)
May 23, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company.(de Witt, Alexander)
May 23, 2024 Filing 5 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (de Witt, Alexander)
May 23, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (de Witt, Alexander)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Augusta County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 5/16/2024. (Order mailed to Augusta County Circuit Court via US Mail)(jv)
May 16, 2024 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (jv)
May 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Augusta County Circuit Court, case number CL24001037-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $405, receipt number AVAWDC-4429691), filed by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1. State Court filings)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mawyer v. State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Mawyer
Represented By: James Huntington Odom, III
Represented By: John B. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Represented By: Alexander Spotswood de Witt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?