V Trust Carriers Inc v. Ethier et al
Plaintiff: V Trust Carriers Inc
Defendant: Denis Ethier and Papineau International SEC
Case Number: 6:2018cv00074
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Lynchburg Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) Jury Trial set for 8/13/2019 and 8/14/2019 at 09:30 AM in Lynchburg before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (sfc)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL ORDER (CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou as set forth herein). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on August 21, 2018. (ca)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by V Trust Carriers Inc (Shahtakhtinski, Ismail)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 State Court Records from Rockbridge County Circuit Court. (ca)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Original Case File from Rockbridge County Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on August 6, 2018. (ca)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Papineau International SEC identifying Corporate Parent TFI International, Inc. for Papineau International SEC. (ca)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockbridge County Circuit Court, Case Number CL18000406-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $400, Receipt No. 0423-2949293), filed by Defendants Denis Ethier & Papineau International SEC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: V Trust Carriers Inc v. Ethier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V Trust Carriers Inc
Represented By: Ismail Tofig Shahtakhtinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis Ethier
Represented By: Elena Georgiev Patarinski
Represented By: Lindsey Anne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papineau International SEC
Represented By: Elena Georgiev Patarinski
Represented By: Lindsey Anne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?