Gebo Cermex USA, Inc. et al v. Alliance Industrial Corporation
Plaintiff: Gebo Cermex USA, Inc., Gebo Cermex Canada Inc. and Gebo Packaging Solutions France S.A.S.
Defendant: Alliance Industrial Corporation
Case Number: 6:2018cv00080
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. § 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 19 Exhibit AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner (Sloan, Michael)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Alliance Industrial Corporation's answer, or other responsive pleading, must be filed on or before January 15, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on November 7, 2018. (ca)
November 6, 2018 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Alliance Industrial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pulley, Glenn)
October 17, 2018 Filing 16 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gebo Cermex Canada Inc., Gebo Cermex USA, Inc., Gebo Packaging Solutions France S.A.S. identifying Corporate Parent Gebo Cermex Participations BV, Corporate Parent Gebo Cermex Participations BV for Gebo Cermex Canada Inc., Gebo Cermex USA, Inc., Gebo Packaging Solutions France S.A.S.. (Sloan, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Alliance Industrial Corporation answer due 11/16/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on October 17, 2018. (sfc)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORAL ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Kimberly K. Dodd to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kimberly K. Dodd for Alliance Industrial Corporation added. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on October 16, 2018. (ca)
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alliance Industrial Corporation (Pulley, Glenn)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Alliance Industrial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pulley, Glenn)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Filing Requirement (SECOND NOTICE) to Plaintiffs Gebo Cermex USA, Inc., Gebo Cermex Canada Inc., & Gebo Packaging Solutions France S.A.S. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ca)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Kimberly K. Dodd to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-2995767. by Alliance Industrial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pulley, Glenn)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Walthall Pulley on behalf of Alliance Industrial Corporation (Pulley, Glenn)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Morgan on behalf of Alliance Industrial Corporation (Morgan, Amanda)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN of service of Summons and Complaint on 9/26/2018 upon Alliance Industrial Corporation(sfc)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Robert Hart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Robert Hart for Gebo Cermex USA, Inc., Gebo Cermex Canada Inc., and Gebo Packaging Solutions France S.A.S. added. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on October 1, 2018. (ca)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 First MOTION for Robert Hart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Gebo Cermex Canada Inc., Gebo Cermex USA, Inc., Gebo Packaging Solutions France S.A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sloan, Michael)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Requirement to Gebo Cermex USA, Inc., Gebo Cermex Canada Inc., & Gebo Packaging Solutions France S.A.S. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ca)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by the Clerk. (ca)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alliance Industrial Corporation. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ca)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Alliance Industrial Corporation (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00, Receipt No. 0423-2983750), filed by Gebo Cermex USA, Inc., Gebo Cermex Canada Inc., & Gebo Packaging Solutions France S.A.S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gebo Cermex USA, Inc. et al v. Alliance Industrial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gebo Cermex USA, Inc.
Represented By: Rhonda Lee Overstreet
Represented By: Michael Ryan Sloan
Represented By: Robert Patrick Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gebo Cermex Canada Inc.
Represented By: Rhonda Lee Overstreet
Represented By: Michael Ryan Sloan
Represented By: Robert Patrick Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gebo Packaging Solutions France S.A.S.
Represented By: Rhonda Lee Overstreet
Represented By: Michael Ryan Sloan
Represented By: Robert Patrick Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Industrial Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly Kristin Dodd
Represented By: Glenn Walthall Pulley
Represented By: Amanda M. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?