Alexander v. BB&T
Plaintiff: Jon D. Alexander
Defendant: BB&T
Case Number: 6:2019cv00066
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 Additional Evidence by Jon D. Alexander. (al)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for insufficient service of process . filed by BB&T. (Conkle, Brooke)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 ADDITIONAL RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for insufficient service of process filed by Jon D. Alexander. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(sfc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for insufficient service of process filed by Jon D. Alexander. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(sfc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Roseboro Notice to Jon D. Alexander, re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for insufficient service of process. Deadline set for 11/4/2019. (ca)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by BB&T identifying Corporate Parent BB&T Corporation for BB&T. (Conkle, Brooke)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for insufficient service of process . filed by BB&T. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons))(Conkle, Brooke)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for insufficient service of process by BB&T. (Conkle, Brooke)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BB&T (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00, Receipt No. 6-2397), filed by Jon D. Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Additional Documents - Part 1, #2 Additional Documents - Part 2, #3 Cover Letter and Attachments, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. BB&T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon D. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BB&T
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?