Francis v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mary S. Francis
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv00037
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Aetna Inc. for Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Dickinson, Ian)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Dickinson, Ian)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The deadline for Aetna Life Insurance Company to file a responsive pleading in this action is thereby EXTENDED to July 28, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on July 7, 2020. (ca)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dickinson, Ian)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Aetna Life Insurance Company on 06/16/2020, filed by Mary S. Francis.(Holt, Kevin)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney J. Anthony Vessel for Mary S. Francis added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on June 15, 2020. (ca)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Oral ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #4 MOTION for J. Anthony Vessel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motions referred to Robert S. Ballou. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 6/12/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(al)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for J. Anthony Vessel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3412135. by Mary S. Francis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit J. Anthony Vessel Pro Hac Vice)(Holt, Kevin)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mary S. Francis. (al)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(al)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company filed by Mary S. Francis. (Filing & Administrative fee $400, receipt # 0423-3411168). (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(al)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary S. Francis
Represented By: Kevin Walker Holt
Represented By: J. Anthony Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian Ramsey-Baird Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?