Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc. v. Emerson Creek Events, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc.
Defendant: Emerson Creek Events, Inc., Christina Demiduk, Countryview Pottery Co. and David Demiduk
Case Number: 6:2020cv00054
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc.. All Defendants.(Willett, Henry)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence E. Laubscher, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Laubscher, Lawrence)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 22, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Garfield Goodrum for Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc. added Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 8/24/2020. (al)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Oral ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Dkt. 4 for Garfield Goodrum to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 8/21/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(al)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Trademark by the Clerk (dg)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Garfield Goodrum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3466163. by Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Willett, Henry)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Countryview Pottery Co., Christina Demiduk, David Demiduk, Emerson Creek Events, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Emerson Creek Events, #2 Summons Issued Christina Demiduk, #3 Summons Issued David Demiduk)(dg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc. (dg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Countryview Pottery Co., Christina Demiduk, David Demiduk, Emerson Creek Events, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400. Receipt number 0423-3465377.), filed by Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc. v. Emerson Creek Events, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Irving Willett, III
Represented By: Garfield Bernard Goodrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Creek Events, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence E. Laubscher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Demiduk
Represented By: Lawrence E. Laubscher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countryview Pottery Co.
Represented By: Lawrence E. Laubscher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Demiduk
Represented By: Lawrence E. Laubscher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?