Anderson v. O'Herron et al
Plaintiff: Brenda M. Anderson
Defendant: Matthew O'Herron and New Prime, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00004
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 Paper State Court Records received from Rockbridge County Circuit Court, CL20000331-00, consisting of 1 Envelope, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(al)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Rockbridge County Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal filed by New Prime, Inc., Matthew O'Herron. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 2/18/2021. (al) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/19/2021) Document modified and replaced to reflect the correct state court case number (al). Modified on 2/19/2021 (al).
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Matthew O'Herron (Graves, Terrence)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Prime, Inc. (Graves, Terrence)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Requirement - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (al)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockbridge County Circuit Court, case number CL20000331-00, filed by Matthew O'Herron, New Prime Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $402, pay.gov filing fee receipt number BVAWDC-362992). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(al) Modified on 2/19/2021 Modified to correct the State Court case number (al).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. O'Herron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda M. Anderson
Represented By: Raphael Ellis Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew O'Herron
Represented By: Terrence Lemarr Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Prime, Inc.
Represented By: Terrence Lemarr Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?