Esposito v. Centra Health, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Esposito
Defendant: Centra Health, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00039
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 Clerks Entry of Dismissal without prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (al)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph Esposito. (Shoen, Darren)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) by Joseph Esposito. (Shoen, Darren)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER, (CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou as set forth herein). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 7/29/2021. (al)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Centra Health, Inc.. (Gardner, Michael)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Centra Health, Inc.. (Gardner, Michael)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 Certified State Court Records received electronically from Circuit Court for the City of Lynchburg, CL21000478-00. (al)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Circuit Court for Lynchburg City re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Centra Health, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 7/21/2021. (al)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Centra Health, Inc. (ca)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lynchburg Circuit Court, Case Number CL21000478-00 (Filing & Administrative fee $402.00, Receipt No. AVAWDC-3750372), filed by Centra Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons, Complaint, Interrogatories to Defendant, and Notice, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Payment Confirmation Email with Receipt No.)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esposito v. Centra Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Esposito
Represented By: Darren Shoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centra Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Preston Gardner
Represented By: Richard Patrick Bolling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?