N.K., An Infant v. Branham et al
Plaintiff: N.K., An Infant
Defendant: Charlie W. Branham and ECO Hauling, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00042
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by N.K., An Infant (Olin, Kristopher)
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 Paper State Court Records received from Rockbridge County Circuit Court, CL21000517-00, consisting of 1 Envelope, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.). (ca)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for September 14 - 15, 2022 at 9:30 AM in Lynchburg before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ca)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER (CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou as set forth herein). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on August 2, 2021. (ca)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by ECO Hauling, Inc. (Morris, Donald)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ECO Hauling, Inc..(Morris, Donald)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Charlie W. Branham.(Morris, Donald)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Rockbridge Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on July 29, 2021. (ca)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Requirement to ECO Hauling, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (al)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Rockbridge County, case number CL21000517-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $402, receipt number AVAWDC-3755263), filed by Charlie W. Branham and ECO Hauling, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Billing Summary/Health Insurance Claim Form, #3 Exhibit C - Entity Information, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(al)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.K., An Infant v. Branham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.K., An Infant
Represented By: Kristopher Robert Olin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie W. Branham
Represented By: Donald Edward Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECO Hauling, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Edward Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?